02.04.2022 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 04.05.2022 [2022/18] |
08.03.2022 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
16.12.2021 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.07.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
13.07.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.06.2021 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
09.06.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.02.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.04.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] |
24.04.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] |
12.02.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.02.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.10.2019 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 06.11.2019 [2019/45] |
04.10.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.11.2019 [2019/45] |
04.10.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.11.2019 [2019/45] |
28.06.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
28.06.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
24.05.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.05.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.04.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
24.04.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
24.04.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.09.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.09.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|