Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3518513 | Global Dossier | 06.11.2019 | A4 | EP3518513 | 31.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN73658 | 22.01.2018 | CN201710097212 | 22.02.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018153194 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201710097212 | 22.02.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108462801B | Global Dossier | 15.12.2020 | B | CN108462801 | 28.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201710097212 | 22.02.2017 |