EP3586233 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR PROBLEM-ALERT AGGREGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.12.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRECOGNIZE LTD. 1 Sheizaf Street 6091000 Bnei Zion / IL | [2020/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINCHEVSKI, Chen 1 Sheizaf Street 6091000 Bnei Zion / IL | 02 /
MANOR, Raanan 38 Henrietta Sold St. Haifa 3472214 / IL | [2020/40] |
Former [2020/01] | 01 /
LINCHEVSKI, Chen 1 Sheizaf Street 6091000 Bnei Zion / IL | ||
02 /
MANOR, Raanan Henrietta Sold 38 34722 Haifa / IL | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Johanna Industrial Property Services GmbH Rosenweg 14 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | [2020/01] | Application number, filing date | 18758219.2 | 30.01.2018 | [2020/01] | WO2018IL50101 | Priority number, date | US201715440081 | 23.02.2017 Original published format: US201715440081 | [2020/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018154558 | Date: | 30.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3586233 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/00, G06F11/07, G06F11/32, H04L12/24, G05B23/02, F02D41/22, F02D41/24, // G06F11/30 | [2021/02] | CPC: |
G06F11/0754 (EP,US);
F02D41/22 (EP,US);
F02D41/2425 (EP,US);
G05B23/0272 (EP,US);
G06F11/0709 (EP,US);
G06F11/0736 (EP);
G06F11/0781 (EP);
G06F11/321 (EP);
H04L41/0604 (EP,US);
H04L41/0681 (EP,US);
F02D2041/228 (EP,US);
G05B2219/2637 (EP,US);
G06F11/079 (EP);
G06F11/3055 (EP);
H04L41/22 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/01] | G06F11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR PROBLEMALARMAGGREGATION | [2020/01] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR PROBLEM-ALERT AGGREGATION | [2020/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES D'AGRÉGATION D'ALERTE DE PROBLÈME | [2020/01] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 22.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2019 | Examination requested [2020/01] | 03.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2002163427 (ERYUREK EVREN [US], et al) [I] 1-3,12,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0090] * * the whole document *; | [A]US2014215618 (STRIEM AMIT YONATAN [IL]) [A] 1-3,12,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0086] * * the whole document *; | [XI]US2016379282 (HILL WILLIAM MCGINLEY [US], et al) [X] 4-7,10,11,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0165] - paragraph [0239] * * paragraph [0310] - paragraph [0313] * * the whole document *[I] 8,9 | International search | [Y]US2012254792 (HUSOY KRISTOFFER [NO], et al) [Y] 1-15 * , entire document especially para [0023], [0029], [0066]-[0090] *; | [Y]US2017046374 (FLETCHER TRISTAN ANTONIO [US], et al) [Y] 1-15* , entire document especially para [0522], [0527], [0679], [0789], [1048], [1201], [1202], [1548], [1683] * |