EP3567675 - TERMINAL ANTENNA AND TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Su Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
WEN, Huailin Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/46] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/46] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18758458.6 | 09.02.2018 | [2019/46] | WO2018CN75959 | Priority number, date | CN201710101960 | 23.02.2017 Original published format: CN201710101960 | [2019/46] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018153283 | Date: | 30.08.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3567675 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/38, H01Q9/04, H01Q3/44 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
H01Q1/38 (EP,US);
H01Q1/12 (CN);
H01Q15/006 (US);
H01Q1/22 (CN,US);
H01Q1/364 (CN);
H01Q1/528 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/06] | H01Q1/38, G05B19/418, H01Q9/04, H01Q3/44 | ||
Former IPC [2019/46] | H01Q1/38, G05B19/418 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/46] | Title | German: | ENDGERÄTANTENNE UND ENDGERÄT | [2019/46] | English: | TERMINAL ANTENNA AND TERMINAL | [2019/46] | French: | ANTENNE DE TERMINAL ET TERMINAL | [2019/46] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2019 | Translation filed | 07.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 07.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/46] | 28.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/48] | 12.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6646605 (MCKINZIE III WILLIAM E [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,11-14 * figures 1, 15, 16, 21-25 * * column 3, line 10 - line 25 * * column 10, line 34 - line 43 * * column 11, line 48 - column 12, line 7 * [Y] 7,9,10; | [X]US6567048 (MCKINZIE III WILLIAM E [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * figures 3, 12-16, 25-27, 30-34 * * column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 14 *; | [X]US6075485 (LILLY JAMES D [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * figures 3, 12-16, 25-27 * * column 12, line 5 - line 18 *; | [Y]US8373599 (LIN SHIH-CHIEH [TW], et al) [Y] 7,9,10 * figures 1, 2 * * column 2, line 6 - line 14 * * column 2, line 55 - line 61 * | International search | [XY]CN101800107 (UNIV JIAOTONG SOUTHWEST) [X] 1, 3, 12-14 * . description. paragraphs 0010 and 0017 and figure 1, description, paragraphs 0010 and 0017, and figure 1 * [Y] 2; | [Y]US5726655 (ACHER OLIVIER [FR], et al) [Y] 2 * , description, column 1, lines 57-64, and column 2, line 52, and figures 14 and 15 *; | [XY]US2015194726 (MINKO GLENN [US], et al) [X] 1, 3, 12-14 [Y] 2; | [A]CN103887588 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [A] 1-14 * , entire document *; | [A]US2009079650 (EGUCHI TOMOKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * , entire document * |