EP3585990 - ENGINE COOLING SYSTEM INCLUDING COOLED EXHAUST SEATS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.12.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cummins Inc. 500 Jackson Street Columbus, IN 47201 / US | [2020/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERR, Andrew P. 2760 West Carr Hill Road Columbus, Indiana 47201 / US | 02 /
BREMMER, Robin J. 6067 Chinkapin Drive Columbus, Indiana 47201 / US | 03 /
SAAD, Philipe F. 4422 Mallard Point Columbus, Indiana 47201 / US | 04 /
AKINOLA, Akintomide K. 2981 Branch Street Whiteland, Indiana 46184 / US | 05 /
LEWIS, JR., Rick Vaughan 1564 Brookfield Circle Franklin, Indiana 46131 / US | 06 /
CHAN, Dennis King 1016 South Hill Court Bloomington, Indiana 47401 / US | [2020/01] | Representative(s) | Pinnington, Giles Oliver Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [2020/01] | Application number, filing date | 18758508.8 | 22.02.2018 | [2020/01] | WO2018US19099 | Priority number, date | US201762463228P | 24.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762463228 P | [2020/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018156682 | Date: | 30.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3585990 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F01P3/14, F02F1/10, F02F1/14, F02F1/36, F02F1/40, F02F1/42, F01L3/02, F01L3/12, F01L3/18, F01L3/22, F01P3/02 | [2020/50] | CPC: |
F02F1/40 (EP,US);
F01L3/02 (EP);
F01L3/04 (US);
F01L3/12 (EP);
F01L3/18 (EP,US);
F01L3/22 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/01] | F01P3/14, F02F1/10, F02F1/14, F02F1/36, F02F1/40, F02F1/42, F01L3/02, F01L3/12, F01L3/18, F01L3/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/01] | Title | German: | MOTORKÜHLSYSTEM MIT GEKÜHLTEN ABGASSITZEN | [2020/01] | English: | ENGINE COOLING SYSTEM INCLUDING COOLED EXHAUST SEATS | [2020/01] | French: | SYSTÈME DE REFROIDISSEMENT DE MOTEUR COMPRENANT DES SIÈGES D'ÉCHAPPEMENT REFROIDIS | [2020/01] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 19.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2019 | Examination requested [2020/01] | 10.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4522161 (SLEE ROGER H [GB]) [Y] 6,7,14 * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 32 * * figures 2-4 *; | [Y]EP0186888 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG [DE]) [Y] 7,14* figure 1 *; | [Y]DE4328904 (AVL VERBRENNUNGSKRAFT MESSTECH [AT]) [Y] 7,14 * figures 1-5 *; | [XY]DE102014012807 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8-11,15 * paragraphs [0018] - [0032] * * figures 1-2 * [Y] 6,7,14; | [XY]US2016195035 (PÖSCHL ROBERT [AT], et al) [X] 1-5,8-13,15 * paragraphs [0024] - [0050] * * figures 1-5 * [Y] 6,7,14 | International search | [YA]US4522161 (SLEE ROGER H [GB]) [Y] 8, 9, 18 * ; abstract; figures 2-4; column 2, line 44-column 3, line 32). * [A] 10, 19; | [A]US2011220043 (ESCRIVA JEROME [FR], et al) [A] 1-5, 13, 15-17 * ; entire document *; | [A]US2015007792 (FAROOQUI SEEMA IFFAT [US], et al) [A] 1, 8-9* ; abstract; figures 2-4; paragraphs [0016]-[0017], [0019], [0020]-[0021], [0024] *; | [A]US2016108850 (PÖSCHL ROBERT [AT], et al) [A] 1-7, 11-17, 20 * ; abstract; figures 2, 5; paragraphs [0015]-[0016], [0034], [0036], [0037] *; | [XYA]US2016195035 (PÖSCHL ROBERT [AT], et al) [X] 1-7, 11-17, 20 * ; abstract; figures 3-5; paragraphs [0028]-[0032]. [0041], [0043]-[0044] * [Y] 8, 9, 18 [A] 10, 19; | [XP]CN107143430 (SHANGHAI MARINE DIESEL ENGINE RES INST) [XP] 1-5, 13, 15-17 * ; entire document * |