EP3676359 - MICROWAVE ASSISTED EXTRACTION OF ESSENTIAL OILS FROM PLANT BIOMASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.06.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firmenich SA 7, Rue de la Bergère 1242 Satigny / CH | [2020/40] |
Former [2020/28] | For all designated states Firmenich SA 1, route des Jeunes P.O. Box 239 1211 Geneva 8 / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROCHET, Xavier Firmenich Grasse SAS Parc Industriel Les Bois de Grasse 06131 Grasse / FR | 02 /
PINEAU, Philippe Firmenich Grasse SAS Parc Industriel Les Bois de Grasse 06131 Grasse / FR | [2020/28] | Representative(s) | dsm-firmenich IP Wurmisweg 576 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2020/28] | Baumgartner Harris, Pauline Firmenich SA Corporate Legal & Compliance - IP Group 7, rue de la Bergère P.O. Box 148 1217 Meyrin 2 / CH | Application number, filing date | 18758884.3 | 29.08.2018 | [2020/28] | WO2018EP73242 | Priority number, date | US201762552593P | 31.08.2017 Original published format: US 201762552593 P | EP20170198347 | 25.10.2017 Original published format: EP 17198347 | [2020/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019043058 | Date: | 07.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3676359 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C11B9/02 | [2020/28] | CPC: |
C11B9/02 (EP);
C11B9/027 (EP,US);
A61K8/922 (US);
A61K8/9789 (US);
A61K8/9794 (US);
A61Q13/00 (US);
A61Q19/00 (US);
A61Q5/00 (US);
A61Q5/02 (US);
B01D11/0211 (EP,US);
B01D11/023 (EP,US);
B01D11/0284 (EP);
B01D11/0488 (EP);
C11B9/0015 (US);
C11B9/0019 (US);
C11B9/003 (US);
C11B9/0034 (US);
C11B9/0046 (US);
C11B9/0049 (US);
C11B9/0061 (US);
C11B9/0076 (US);
C11B9/008 (US);
C11B9/0092 (US);
C11B9/0096 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/28] | Title | German: | MIKROWELLENUNTERSTÜTZTE EXTRAKTION ESSENZIELLER ÖLE AUS PFLANZENBIOMASSE | [2020/28] | English: | MICROWAVE ASSISTED EXTRACTION OF ESSENTIAL OILS FROM PLANT BIOMASS | [2020/28] | French: | EXTRACTION D'HUILES ESSENTIELLES À PARTIR DE BIOMASSE VÉGÉTALE ASSISTÉE PAR MICRO-ONDES | [2020/28] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/28] | 31.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1618798 (MILESTONE SRL [IT], et al); | [X]EP1955749 (MILESTONE SRL [IT], et al); | by applicant | FR3003181 |