EP3669621 - PLASMA GENERATOR MODULE AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DBD Plasma GmbH Bertha-von-Suttner-Straße 5 37085 Göttingen / DE | [2020/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VIÖL, Wolfgang Heideweg 11 37139 Adelebsen / DE | 02 /
WIENEKE, Stephan Meierhof 19 37079 Göttingen / DE | 03 /
GREDNER, Alexander Friedländer-Straße 17a 37133 Friedland / DE | 04 /
FREIER, Daniel Vorm Piepenbrink 7 37120 Bovenden / DE | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | REHBERG HÜPPE + PARTNER Patentanwälte PartG mbB Robert-Gernhardt-Platz 1 37073 Göttingen / DE | [2020/26] | Application number, filing date | 18759051.8 | 08.08.2018 | [2020/26] | WO2018EP71517 | Priority number, date | DE201710118652 | 16.08.2017 Original published format: DE102017118652 | [2020/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019034496 | Date: | 21.02.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3669621 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3669621 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H05H1/24, A61L2/14 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
H05H1/2406 (EP,US);
H05H1/2418 (EP);
A61L2/14 (EP);
A61L2202/11 (EP);
H05H2240/10 (EP);
H05H2245/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PLASMAGENERATORMODUL UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG | [2020/26] | English: | PLASMA GENERATOR MODULE AND USE THEREOF | [2020/26] | French: | MODULE DE GÉNÉRATION DE PLASMA ET UTILISATION DUDIT MODULE | [2020/26] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/26] | 19.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 29.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2003338399 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [XYI]DE102005029360 (SOFTAL ELEKTRONIK GMBH [DE]); | [Y]EP1767068 (JE PLASMACONSULT GMBH [DE]); | [YD]US2008061035 (KIM YI J [KR]); | [A]KR101709167B (AGENCY DEFENSE DEV [KR]) | by applicant | WO0154464 | US2008061035 | WO2010083040 | WO2011095245 | WO2014093513 | DE102013113941 | CN204598448U | WO2015164760 |