02.08.2024 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
30.07.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.07.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
22.07.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
22.07.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
21.03.2024 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.02.2024 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] |
23.02.2024 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] |
23.02.2024 |
Change - German title |
published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] |
23.02.2024 |
Change - English title |
published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] |
23.02.2024 |
Change - French title |
published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] |
10.07.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.08.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.07.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
25.03.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.03.2022 |
First examination report |
|
16.07.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.10.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
23.10.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
06.10.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.08.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.05.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
22.05.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
22.05.2020 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
22.05.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
20.03.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.03.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
18.03.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.04.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.03.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.02.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.09.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|