Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11549698 | Global Dossier | 10.01.2023 | B2 | US2020232663 | 23.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE202018102124 | 17.04.2018 | WO2018EP72362 | 17.08.2018 | DE102017118977 | 18.08.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3669127 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2024 | B1 | EP3669127 | 24.06.2020 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE202018102124 | 17.04.2018 | WO2018EP72362 | 17.08.2018 | DE102017118977 | 18.08.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102017118977 | 21.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102017118977 | 18.08.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE202018102124U | 21.11.2018 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE102017118977 | 18.08.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11202001456P | 30.03.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | DE202018102124 | 17.04.2018 | WO2018EP72362 | 17.08.2018 | DE102017118977 | 18.08.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019034789 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2019 | A3 | WO2019034789 | 21.02.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE202018102124 | 17.04.2018 | DE102017118977 | 18.08.2017 |