EP3672800 - LAMINATED GLASS, LAMINATED SAFETY GLASS, AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEEN AG Kronbergstrasse 11 9104 Waldstatt / CH | [2021/20] |
Former [2020/27] | For all designated states Seen GmbH Kronbergstrasse 11 9104 Waldstatt / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEIDLER, Rouven Längacherstrasse 10 3367 Thörigen / CH | [2020/27] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Stralauer Platz 34 10243 Berlin / DE | [2021/15] |
Former [2020/27] | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Anna-Louisa-Karsch-Strasse 2 10178 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 18759089.8 | 21.08.2018 | [2020/27] | WO2018EP72567 | Priority number, date | DE201710119055 | 21.08.2017 Original published format: DE102017119055 | [2020/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019038288 | Date: | 28.02.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3672800 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3672800 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/15] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3672800 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | [2021/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B32B17/10 | [2020/27] | CPC: |
B32B17/10036 (EP,US);
B32B17/10045 (EP,US);
B32B17/10247 (EP,US);
B32B17/10357 (US);
B32B17/10431 (US);
B32B17/1055 (US);
B32B17/10651 (US);
B32B17/1088 (US);
B32B17/10935 (EP,US);
B32B27/06 (EP);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/30 (EP);
B32B27/306 (EP);
B32B27/36 (EP);
B32B27/40 (EP);
B32B3/08 (EP);
B32B3/085 (US);
B32B7/12 (EP,US);
B32B17/10192 (US);
B32B17/1022 (US);
B32B17/10761 (US);
B32B2250/04 (EP);
B32B2250/05 (EP);
B32B2250/40 (EP,US);
B32B2307/402 (EP,US);
B32B2307/408 (EP);
B32B2307/412 (EP,US);
B32B2307/416 (EP,US);
B32B2307/51 (EP);
B32B2307/5825 (EP);
B32B2571/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B32B17/10005, B32B2367/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBUNDGLAS, VERBUNDSICHERHEITSGLAS UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SOLCHEN | [2020/27] | English: | LAMINATED GLASS, LAMINATED SAFETY GLASS, AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2020/27] | French: | VITRAGE FEUILLETÉ, VITRAGE FEUILLETÉ DE SÉCURITÉ ET PROCÉDÉ POUR SA FABRICATION | [2020/27] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/27] | 23.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.08.2018 | AL | 14.04.2021 | CY | 14.04.2021 | CZ | 14.04.2021 | DK | 14.04.2021 | EE | 14.04.2021 | FI | 14.04.2021 | HR | 14.04.2021 | LT | 14.04.2021 | LV | 14.04.2021 | MC | 14.04.2021 | MK | 14.04.2021 | MT | 14.04.2021 | NL | 14.04.2021 | RO | 14.04.2021 | RS | 14.04.2021 | SE | 14.04.2021 | SI | 14.04.2021 | SK | 14.04.2021 | SM | 14.04.2021 | BG | 14.07.2021 | NO | 14.07.2021 | GR | 15.07.2021 | IS | 14.08.2021 | PT | 16.08.2021 | IE | 21.08.2021 | LU | 21.08.2021 | BE | 31.08.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 21.08.2018 | |
AL | 14.04.2021 | ||
CY | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
MK | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
IE | 21.08.2021 | ||
LU | 21.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 21.08.2018 | |
AL | 14.04.2021 | ||
CY | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
IE | 21.08.2021 | ||
LU | 21.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
CY | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
IE | 21.08.2021 | ||
LU | 21.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
IE | 21.08.2021 | ||
LU | 21.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
LU | 21.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
LU | 21.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
LU | 21.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | CZ | 14.04.2021 | |
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
LU | 21.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | CZ | 14.04.2021 | |
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | CZ | 14.04.2021 | |
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | CZ | 14.04.2021 | |
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | CZ | 14.04.2021 | |
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | FI | 14.04.2021 | |
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 14.04.2021 | |
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | FI | 14.04.2021 | |
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 14.04.2021 | |
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 14.04.2021 | |
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 14.04.2021 | |
LT | 14.04.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2996419 (SCHMICK HAYES J) [A] 1-21 * column 4, line 59 - line 69; figure -; claim - *; | [AD]DE2313278 (DU PONT) [AD] 1-21 * example 2; claim - *; | [A]US6258429 (NELSON STEPHEN G [US]) [A] 1-21 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]JP2004307303 (MAEDA KANKYO BIJUTSU KK, et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * the whole document *; | [A]DE102006057049 (TROESCH GLAS AG [CH]) [A] 1-21 * figure -; claim - *; | [AD]US2009169795 (FIECHTER ANDRE [CH]) [AD] 1-21 * paragraphs [0010] , [0189] , [0201]; figure -; claims 1,3-5 *; | [A]EP2248676 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-21 * paragraphs [0034] - [0059]; figures 1,2,; claim - *; | [AP]FR3052390 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [AP] 1-21* page 7, line 1 - line 24; figures 2-5; claims 1,4-9 * | by applicant | DE230759 | DE2313278 | DD295720 | US2009169795 | DE202008008318U |