EP3658518 - AQUEOUS POLYMERIC COMPOSITION AND COPOLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/23] | AQUEOUS POLYMER COMPOSITION AND COPOLYMER | ||
[2021/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.02.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coatex 35 rue Ampère 69730 Genay / FR | [2020/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAMPAGNE, Clémentine 46 rue de Margnolles 69300 Caluire-et-Cuire / FR | 02 /
MELAS, Michel 61 Allée des Hélianthes 69250 Montanay / FR | 03 /
PARRENIN, Laurie 97 impasse de l'ancienne gare 01480 Villeneuve / FR | 04 /
SUAU, Jean-Marc 60 chemin Perrault 69480 Lucenay / FR | [2021/34] |
Former [2020/23] | 01 /
CHAMPAGNE, Clémentine 46 rue de Margnolles 69300 Caluire-et-Cuire / FR | ||
02 /
MELAS, Michel 61 Allée des Hélianthes 69250 Montanay / FR | |||
03 /
PARRENIN, Laurie 20 rue des Mollières Allée 4 69730 Genay / FR | |||
04 /
SUAU, Jean-Marc 60 chemin Perrault 69480 Lucenay / FR | Representative(s) | Balmefrezol, Ludovic Francis Pierre Coatex SAS 35, rue Ampère 69730 Genay / FR | [2020/23] | Application number, filing date | 18759159.9 | 25.07.2018 | [2020/23] | WO2018FR51901 | Priority number, date | FR20170057232 | 28.07.2017 Original published format: FR 1757232 | [2020/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019020935 | Date: | 31.01.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3658518 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3658518 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/04, C04B24/26, C08F216/14 | [2021/14] | CPC: |
C04B24/2647 (EP,KR,US);
C08F220/06 (KR,US);
C04B14/06 (KR);
C04B24/2605 (US);
C04B24/267 (EP,KR);
C04B28/04 (EP,KR);
C08F2/16 (US);
C08F2/44 (KR);
C08F216/1433 (EP,KR,US);
C08F220/38 (KR);
C08F222/06 (KR);
C08K5/38 (KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B28/04, C04B14/06, C04B24/267, C04B2103/50 (EP);
C08F216/1433, C08F220/06 (US,EP);
C08F216/1433, C08F220/06, C08F222/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/23] | C04B24/26, C04B26/04, C08F216/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE POLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND COPOLYMER | [2020/23] | English: | AQUEOUS POLYMERIC COMPOSITION AND COPOLYMER | [2021/14] | French: | COMPOSITION POLYMÉRIQUE AQUEUSE ET COPOLYMÈRE | [2020/23] |
Former [2020/23] | AQUEOUS POLYMER COMPOSITION AND COPOLYMER | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/23] | 16.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.07.2018 | AL | 25.08.2021 | AT | 25.08.2021 | CY | 25.08.2021 | CZ | 25.08.2021 | DK | 25.08.2021 | EE | 25.08.2021 | FI | 25.08.2021 | HR | 25.08.2021 | LT | 25.08.2021 | LV | 25.08.2021 | MC | 25.08.2021 | MK | 25.08.2021 | MT | 25.08.2021 | RO | 25.08.2021 | RS | 25.08.2021 | SE | 25.08.2021 | SI | 25.08.2021 | SK | 25.08.2021 | SM | 25.08.2021 | BG | 25.11.2021 | NO | 25.11.2021 | GR | 26.11.2021 | IS | 25.12.2021 | PT | 27.12.2021 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/24] | HU | 25.07.2018 | |
AL | 25.08.2021 | ||
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CY | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
MK | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CY | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
MK | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CY | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2016146935 (COATEX SAS [FR]) [Y] 1-19 * Copolymère B; page 22, lines 1-26 * * claims 6,8 * * page 19, lines 19-34 * * page 23, line 26 - page 24, line 24 * * compositions 3 et 4;; table 1 *; | [Y]US2014088250 (SUAU JEAN-MARC [FR], et al) [Y] 1-19 * paragraphs [0072] , [ 105] * * Tests 6 et 7 *; | [Y]US2014051801 (SULSER UELI [CH], et al) [Y] 1-19 * example 1 * * paragraphs [0151] , [0152] * | by applicant | WO2016146935 | US2014088250 | US2014051801 |