EP3661626 - DEVICE FOR REDUCING FUMES, DUST AND ODOURS OF A GASEOUS FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.04.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.02.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Onofri, Mauro Via Rotonda Segnatello 8 40010 Bentivoglio (Bologna) / IT | For all designated states Meogrossi, Nino Via Galliera Sud 69/A 40018 San Pietro in Casale (Bologna) / IT | [2020/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEOGROSSI, Nino Via Galliera Sud 69/A 40018 San Pietro in Casale (Bologna) / IT | [2020/24] | Representative(s) | Casadei, Barbara Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | [2020/24] | Application number, filing date | 18759176.3 | 01.08.2018 | [2020/24] | WO2018IB55768 | Priority number, date | IT20170090652 | 04.08.2017 Original published format: IT201700090652 | [2020/24] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019025991 | Date: | 07.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3661626 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/14, B01D47/06, B01D53/18, B01D53/72, B01D53/76 | [2020/24] | CPC: |
B01D53/18 (EP);
B01D47/06 (EP);
B01D53/1487 (EP);
B01D53/72 (EP);
B01D53/76 (EP);
B01D2221/08 (EP);
B01D2247/04 (EP);
B01D2247/08 (EP);
B01D2247/14 (EP);
B01D2257/708 (EP);
B01D2257/90 (EP);
B01D2258/0275 (EP);
B01D2258/0283 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/24] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR REDUKTION VON RAUCHGASEN, STAUB UND GERÜCHEN EINES GASFÖRMIGEN FLUIDS | [2020/24] | English: | DEVICE FOR REDUCING FUMES, DUST AND ODOURS OF A GASEOUS FLUID | [2020/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RÉDUCTION DES FUMÉES, POUSSIÈRES ET ODEURS D'UN FLUIDE GAZEUX | [2020/24] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/24] | 24.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US4588535 (FOIDL LEONHARD [AT]) [X] 1,4,8,10 * abstract * * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 28 * [I] 2,3,5-7,9,11-13; | [X]US3465504 (OROPEZA ESTHER, et al) [X] 1,4,8,10 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 41; figure § *; | [X]WO2016157199 (BIO CLEAN AIR INNOVATION LTD [IL]) [X] 1 * figure 1 *; | [X]WO2013085099 (JINWOO CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [XA]WO9308899 (RJ ENVIRONMENTAL INC [US]) [X] 1 * figure 1 * [A] 2-13; | [XA]US4039307 (BONDOR FRANK SAMUEL) [X] 1 * figures 1-2 * [A] 2-13; | [XA]US5464458 (YAMAMOTO ISAO [JP]) [X] 1 * figure 7 * [A] 2-13; | [I]US4609386 (SIBLEY JOHN R [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * column 2, lines 15-66; figures 1-2 *; | [A]US5876662 (JAIN ROOP C [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * |