EP3837910 - SHARED RESOURCE CONFIGURATION FOR BANDWIDTH PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2022/23] |
Former [2021/25] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERICSON, Mårten Sandåkersvägen 19 954 33 Gammelstad / SE | 02 /
CHRISTOFFERSSON, Jan Stenåsvägen 13 975 61 Luleå / SE | 03 /
WANG, Min Granitstigen 27 977 53 Luleå / SE | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [2022/23] |
Former [2021/25] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 18759421.3 | 16.08.2018 | [2021/25] | WO2018IB56193 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020035718 | Date: | 20.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3837910 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3837910 | Date: | 08.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/12, // H04W72/04, H04W72/14 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
H04W72/21 (EP);
H04W72/1268 (US);
H04W72/0453 (EP,US);
H04W72/23 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2021/25] | H04W72/12, H04W72/04, H04W72/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEMEINSAME BETRIEBSMITTELKONFIGURATION FÜR BANDBREITENTEILE | [2021/25] | English: | SHARED RESOURCE CONFIGURATION FOR BANDWIDTH PARTS | [2021/25] | French: | CONFIGURATION DE RESSOURCES PARTAGÉES POUR DES PARTIES DE BANDE PASSANTE | [2021/25] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 15.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.04.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.08.2018 | AL | 08.06.2022 | AT | 08.06.2022 | CY | 08.06.2022 | CZ | 08.06.2022 | DK | 08.06.2022 | EE | 08.06.2022 | ES | 08.06.2022 | FI | 08.06.2022 | HR | 08.06.2022 | IT | 08.06.2022 | LT | 08.06.2022 | LV | 08.06.2022 | MC | 08.06.2022 | MK | 08.06.2022 | PL | 08.06.2022 | RO | 08.06.2022 | RS | 08.06.2022 | SE | 08.06.2022 | SI | 08.06.2022 | SK | 08.06.2022 | SM | 08.06.2022 | IE | 16.08.2022 | LU | 16.08.2022 | BE | 31.08.2022 | CH | 31.08.2022 | FR | 31.08.2022 | LI | 31.08.2022 | BG | 08.09.2022 | NO | 08.09.2022 | GR | 09.09.2022 | IS | 08.10.2022 | PT | 10.10.2022 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/24] | HU | 16.08.2018 | |
AL | 08.06.2022 | ||
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CY | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
IT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
IE | 16.08.2022 | ||
LU | 16.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
FR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CY | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
IT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
IE | 16.08.2022 | ||
LU | 16.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
FR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
IT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
IE | 16.08.2022 | ||
LU | 16.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
FR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
IE | 16.08.2022 | ||
LU | 16.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
FR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
IE | 16.08.2022 | ||
LU | 16.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
FR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
IE | 16.08.2022 | ||
LU | 16.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
LU | 16.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
LU | 16.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/16] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 08.06.2022 | |
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 08.06.2022 | |
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 08.06.2022 | |
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2013163532 (ANDERSON NICHOLAS WILLIAM [GB], et al) [A] 1-30* paragraphs [0008] - [0218] *; | [A]WO2018116051 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-30 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 17] - [0041]; figures 5, 6a *; | [A] - CATT, "On PUCCH resource allocation", vol. RAN WG1, no. Busan, Korea; 20180521 - 20180525, (20180520), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1806298, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings%5F3GPP%5FSYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20180520), XP051441505 [A] 1-30 * Section 2.1 * | [A] - ERICSSON, "On PUCCH Resource Allocation before RRC Connection", vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens, Greece; 20180226 - 20180302, (20180217), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1802909, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F92/Docs/, (20180217), XP051398298 [A] 1-30 * the whole document * |