|
13.01.2023 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2022 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2022 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2022 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.01.2022 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.01.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.10.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
05.10.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
22.09.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.09.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.09.2021 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2021 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.09.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.09.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.09.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.09.2021 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.09.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.05.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.05.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2021 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2020 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2020 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
15.07.2020 |
Confirmation of effective date of early entry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.07.2020 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.07.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.07.2020 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
01.07.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
01.07.2020 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.06.2020 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.08.2019 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
63 |
|
09.08.2019 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2019 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.08.2019 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
01.08.2019 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
06.11.2018 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
02.11.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
02.11.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
02.11.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
11.09.2018 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
07.08.2018 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
07.08.2018 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
07.08.2018 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
19 |
|
07.08.2018 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
12 |
|
07.08.2018 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
7 |