EP3522272 - CATHODE ACTIVE MATERIAL FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY, PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR, AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2022/13] |
Former [2022/03] | For all designated states LG Energy Solution Ltd. Tower 1, 108 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu 07335 Seoul / KR | ||
Former [2019/32] | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Ji Hye LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Byung Chun LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
BAEK, So Ra LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
YOO, Tae Gu LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 05 /
JUNG, Wang Mo LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2019/32] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/32] | Application number, filing date | 18760273.5 | 28.02.2018 | [2019/32] | WO2018KR02505 | Priority number, date | KR20170026823 | 28.02.2017 Original published format: KR 20170026823 | KR20180023733 | 27.02.2018 Original published format: KR 20180023733 | [2019/32] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018160023 | Date: | 07.09.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3522272 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3522272 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/525, H01M4/505, H01M4/485, C01G53/00, H01M10/052, H01M4/131, H01M10/0525 | [2019/52] | CPC: |
C01G53/006 (EP,US);
H01M4/525 (EP,KR,US);
C01B25/45 (US);
C01G53/50 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/052 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP);
H01M4/131 (EP,US);
H01M4/364 (US);
H01M4/366 (US);
H01M4/485 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/505 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2002/50 (US);
C01P2002/52 (EP,US);
C01P2004/54 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (US);
H01M2004/021 (US);
H01M2004/8689 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/32] | H01M4/525, H01M4/505, H01M4/485, C01G53/00, H01M10/052 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KATHODENAKTIVMATERIAL FÜR EINE LITHIUMSEKUNDÄRBATTERIE, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND LITHIUMSEKUNDÄRBATTERIE DAMIT | [2019/32] | English: | CATHODE ACTIVE MATERIAL FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY, PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR, AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY COMPRISING SAME | [2019/32] | French: | MATÉRIAU ACTIF DE CATHODE POUR PILE RECHARGEABLE AU LITHIUM, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ET PILE RECHARGEABLE AU LITHIUM COMPRENANT LEDIT MATÉRIAU | [2019/32] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2019 | Translation filed | 02.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 02.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/32] | 25.11.2019 | Observations by third parties | 12.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 17.08.2022 | AT | 17.08.2022 | CZ | 17.08.2022 | DK | 17.08.2022 | EE | 17.08.2022 | ES | 17.08.2022 | FI | 17.08.2022 | HR | 17.08.2022 | IT | 17.08.2022 | LT | 17.08.2022 | LV | 17.08.2022 | MC | 17.08.2022 | NL | 17.08.2022 | RO | 17.08.2022 | RS | 17.08.2022 | SI | 17.08.2022 | SK | 17.08.2022 | SM | 17.08.2022 | NO | 17.11.2022 | GR | 18.11.2022 | IS | 17.12.2022 | PT | 19.12.2022 | BE | 28.02.2023 | CH | 28.02.2023 | IE | 28.02.2023 | LI | 28.02.2023 | LU | 28.02.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/12] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MC | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
IE | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
LU | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MC | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
IE | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
LU | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MC | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
LU | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MC | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/44] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MC | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 17.08.2022 | |
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 17.08.2022 | |
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 17.08.2022 | |
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2110872 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [X]US2013089787 (NAGAI HIROKI [JP]) [X] 9,11-13 * paragraph [0012]; claims 2, 3, 5, 6 *; | [XI]EP2654109 (NICHIA CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4,7,9-15 * paragraphs [0046] , [0 57] , [0 58]; example 1 * [I] 6,8; | [A]US2016056458 (TAMURA MASAHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [X]JP2016111000 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO) [X] 1-5,14,15 * abstract *; | [XP]EP3226330 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO [JP]) [XP] 1-5,14,15 * claims 9, 11, 14 * | International search | [XY]JP2015076154 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO) [X] 1-10, 12-20 [Y] 11; | [Y]JP2013051172 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 11; | [Y]JP2012252964 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO, et al) [Y] 11; | [Y]JP2013110037 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1-20; | [A]KR20160052427 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-20 | other | JPS6256956B | KR101958124B | US9742002 | US9793540 | EP2698850 | KR101264364B | US2018123130 | US2014329146 | US2017005333 | US2019020023 | US2018123118 | JPS6210439B | US2017256801 | US9406928 | JP3885764B | US6811925 |