EP3591387 - METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING MOLECULAR STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Tokyo 3-1, Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | [2020/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJITA, Makoto c/o THE UNIVERSITY OF TOKYO 3-1 Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | 02 /
FUJITA, Daishi iCeMS Research Building Yoshida Sakyou-ku, Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | 03 /
DOMOTO, Yuya c/o THE UNIVERSITY OF TOKYO 3-1 Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | 04 /
TAKEZAWA, Hiroki c/o THE UNIVERSITY OF TOKYO 3-1 Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | [2023/39] |
Former [2020/09] | 01 /
FUJITA Makoto c/o THE UNIVERSITY OF TOKYO 3-1 Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | ||
02 /
FUJITA Daishi iCeMS Research Building Yoshida sakyou, Tokyo 606-8501 / JP | |||
03 /
DOMOTO Yuya c/o THE UNIVERSITY OF TOKYO 3-1 Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | |||
04 /
TAKEZAWA Hiroki c/o THE UNIVERSITY OF TOKYO 3-1 Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | |||
Former [2020/02] | 01 /
FUJITA Makoto c/o THE UNIVERSITY OF TOKYO 3-1 Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | ||
02 /
FUJITA Daishi c/o THE UNIVERSITY OF TOKYO 3-1 Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | |||
03 /
DOMOTO Yuya c/o THE UNIVERSITY OF TOKYO 3-1 Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | |||
04 /
TAKEZAWA Hiroki c/o THE UNIVERSITY OF TOKYO 3-1 Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstraße 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/39] | Blodig, Wolfgang Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2020/02] | Schiener, Jens Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstraße 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18760809.6 | 28.02.2018 | [2020/02] | WO2018JP07550 | Priority number, date | JP20170038739 | 01.03.2017 Original published format: JP 2017038739 | [2020/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018159692 | Date: | 07.09.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3591387 | Date: | 08.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3591387 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01N23/205, C30B7/00, G01N23/207 | [2021/10] | CPC: |
G01N23/207 (EP,US);
G01N23/2055 (US);
C30B29/54 (EP);
C30B7/02 (EP);
C30B7/04 (US);
C40B30/10 (US);
C40B40/16 (US);
C40B50/08 (US);
G01N23/20 (US);
G01N23/20008 (US);
G01N23/20091 (US);
G01N23/205 (US);
G01N23/2073 (US);
G01N2223/056 (US);
G01N2223/1016 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/02] | G01N23/205 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG EINER MOLEKULARSTRUKTUR | [2020/02] | English: | METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING MOLECULAR STRUCTURE | [2020/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'IDENTIFICATION D'UNE STRUCTURE MOLÉCULAIRE | [2020/02] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2019 | Translation filed | 01.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 01.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/02] | 23.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.09.2023 | CZ | 27.09.2023 | DK | 27.09.2023 | EE | 27.09.2023 | ES | 27.09.2023 | FI | 27.09.2023 | HR | 27.09.2023 | IT | 27.09.2023 | LT | 27.09.2023 | LV | 27.09.2023 | NL | 27.09.2023 | PL | 27.09.2023 | RO | 27.09.2023 | RS | 27.09.2023 | SE | 27.09.2023 | SK | 27.09.2023 | SM | 27.09.2023 | NO | 27.12.2023 | GR | 28.12.2023 | IS | 27.01.2024 | PT | 29.01.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
IT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 27.09.2023 | |
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005214173 (FACER GEOFFREY [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0103] * * figure - *; | [YA]EP1666646 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) [Y] 1-11 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0109] * * paragraph [0134] - paragraph [0136] * * figure - * [A] 12-15; | [A]US2008119642 (HALL MATTHEW [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0037] * * figure - *; | [A]WO2008141183 (FLUIDIGM CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0037] * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2010095749 (YAMAGUCHI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0112] ** figure 1 *; | [XAI]EP2894242 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH AGENCY [JP]) [X] 12 * paragraph [0134] - paragraph [0214] * * figure - * [A] 1-11 [I] 13-15; | [XYI]EP3118610 (UNIV TOKYO [JP]) [X] 12 * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0192] - paragraph [0196] * * paragraph [0209] * * paragraph [0213] - paragraph [0216] * [Y] 1-11 [I] 13-15; | [A] - CARTER CHARLES W ET AL, "Statistical design of experiments for protein crystal growth and the use of a precrystallization assay", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, (198807), vol. 90, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0022-0248(88)90299-0, ISSN 0022-0248, pages 60 - 73, XP028857648 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-0248(88)90299-0 | [XAI] - YASUHIDE INOKUMA ET AL, "Preparation and guest-uptake protocol for a porous complex useful for 'crystal-free' crystallography", NATURE PROTOCOLS, GB, (20140109), vol. 9, no. 2, doi:10.1038/nprot.2014.007, ISSN 1754-2189, pages 246 - 252, XP055400438 [X] 12 * the whole document * [A] 1-11 [I] 13-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nprot.2014.007 | [XAI] - YASUHIDE INOKUMA ET AL, "X-ray analysis on the nanogram to microgram scale using porous complexes", NATURE, London, (20130328), vol. 495, doi:10.1038/nature11990, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 461 - 466, XP055400439 [X] 12 * the whole document * [A] 1-11 [I] 13-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature11990 | International search | [A]WO2005116608 (NIKON CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-22* , & JP 4317919 B2 *; | [A]WO2014038220 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH AGENCY [JP]) [A] 1-22 * , & US 2015/0219533 A1 & EP 2894242 A1 *; | [A]WO2015137288 (UNIV TOKYO [JP]) [A] 1-22 * , & US 2017/0016138 A1 & EP 3118610 A1 *; | [A]WO2015137246 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH AGENCY [JP]) [A] 1-22 * , & JP 2017-83172 A *; | [A]JP2016160256 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH AGENCY) [A] 1-22 * , (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2016143872 (UNIV TOKYO [JP]) [A] 1-22 * , & JP 2016-166162 A & EP 3269849 A1 *; | [A]JP2017036919 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH AGENCY) [A] 1-22 * , & WO 2015/098152 A1 * | by applicant | WO2014038220 | - Nature, (19950000), vol. 378, pages 469 - 471 | - Angew. Chem. Int. Ed., (19980000), vol. 37, no. 15, pages 2082 - 2085 | - CHEM. COMMUN., (20030000), pages 1808 - 1809 | - Angew. Chem. Int. Ed., (20010000), vol. 40, pages 1718 - 1721 | - Angew. Chem., (20050000), vol. 117, pages 1844 - 1847 | - Angew. Chem. Int. Ed., (20030000), vol. 42, pages 3267 - 3270 | - KAUFFMANN, T.FISCHER, H., Chemische Berichte, (19730000), vol. 106, page 220 | - J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20040000), vol. 126, pages 10818 - 10819 | - J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19990000), vol. 121, no. 32, pages 7457 - 7458 | - Angew. Chem. Int. Ed., (20040000), vol. 43, pages 5936 - 5940 |