EP3536827 - SURFACE PROCESSING METHOD FOR TANTALUM SPINNING HEAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Huayu Chuangxin TA-NB Science & Technology Co., Ltd. 15 Leyuan Street Yanxi Development Area Huairou District Beijing 101407 / CN | For all designated states Beijing Huayu Chuangxin Science & Trade Co., Ltd. 15 Leyuan Street Yanxi Development Area Huairou District Beijing 101407 / CN | [2019/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Yuzhong No. 31 Ren Ai Hutong Hui Gu Gen Yuan No. 2 Guang Ze Road Wangjing, Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | [2019/37] | Representative(s) | Herzog IP Patentanwalts GmbH Steinstraße 16-18 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | [2022/04] |
Former [2019/37] | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Immermannstrasse 40 40210 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 18761041.5 | 02.03.2018 | [2019/37] | WO2018CN77938 | Priority number, date | CN201710124797 | 03.03.2017 Original published format: CN201710124797 | CN201710587999 | 19.07.2017 Original published format: CN201710587999 | [2019/37] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018157867 | Date: | 07.09.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3536827 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3536827 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP3536827 | Date: | 18.05.2022 | [2022/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C25D11/26, D01D4/02 | [2019/37] | CPC: |
C23C28/042 (EP,CN);
C23C28/04 (EP);
C25D11/26 (EP,CN);
C25D9/04 (CN);
D01D4/022 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR TANTALSPINNKOPF | [2019/37] | English: | SURFACE PROCESSING METHOD FOR TANTALUM SPINNING HEAD | [2019/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACE DESTINÉ À UNE TÊTE DE REPOUSSAGE DE TANTALE | [2019/37] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2019 | Translation filed | 07.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2019 | Search fee paid | 07.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/37] | 15.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.12.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.03.2018 | AL | 26.01.2022 | CY | 26.01.2022 | CZ | 26.01.2022 | DK | 26.01.2022 | EE | 26.01.2022 | FI | 26.01.2022 | HR | 26.01.2022 | LT | 26.01.2022 | LV | 26.01.2022 | MC | 26.01.2022 | MK | 26.01.2022 | MT | 26.01.2022 | NL | 26.01.2022 | PL | 26.01.2022 | RO | 26.01.2022 | RS | 26.01.2022 | SE | 26.01.2022 | SI | 26.01.2022 | SK | 26.01.2022 | SM | 26.01.2022 | IE | 02.03.2022 | LU | 02.03.2022 | BE | 31.03.2022 | CH | 31.03.2022 | LI | 31.03.2022 | NO | 26.04.2022 | GR | 27.04.2022 | IS | 26.05.2022 | PT | 26.05.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/24] | HU | 02.03.2018 | |
AL | 26.01.2022 | ||
CY | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
MK | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
IE | 02.03.2022 | ||
LU | 02.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
CY | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
MK | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
IE | 02.03.2022 | ||
LU | 02.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
CY | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
IE | 02.03.2022 | ||
LU | 02.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
IE | 02.03.2022 | ||
LU | 02.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
IE | 02.03.2022 | ||
LU | 02.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
IE | 02.03.2022 | ||
LU | 02.03.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | CZ | 26.01.2022 | |
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | CZ | 26.01.2022 | |
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | DK | 26.01.2022 | |
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | DK | 26.01.2022 | |
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | FI | 26.01.2022 | |
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 26.01.2022 | |
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 26.01.2022 | |
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 26.01.2022 | |
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | LT | 26.01.2022 | |
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 26.01.2022 | |
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | NL | 26.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0196093 (ZHONG LIU YU) [X] 1,2,4,6-8,10,13-15 * the whole document *[A] 3,5,9,11,12; | [XA]JPS62230997 (RIYU YU TSUON) [X] 1,2,4,6-8,10,13-15 * the whole document * [A] 3,5,9,11,12 | International search | [X]CN85101505 ; | [X]US4678546 (YU-ZHONG LIU [CN]); | [X]CN86102269 ; | [X]CN1380450 (BEIJING HUAYU CHUANGXI SCIENCE [CN]); | [X]CN1428465 (BEIJING HUAYU CHUANGXI SCIENCE [CN]); | [A]CN1896303 (UNIV SHANGHAI COMMUNICATION [CN]) | by applicant | CN19851001505 | CN19861002269 | CN20021006915 |