EP3679027 - DIHYDROBENZIMIDAZOLONES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C4 Therapeutics, Inc. 490 Arsenal Way, Suite 200 Watertown, MA 02472 / US | [2020/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOERGLER, Annick c/o F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | 02 /
NORCROSS, Roger c/o F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | 03 /
DEY, Fabian c/o F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | 04 /
KUSZNIR, Eric Andre c/o F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2020/29] | Representative(s) | Bassil, Nicholas Charles, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2020/29] | Application number, filing date | 18762093.5 | 03.09.2018 | [2020/29] | WO2018EP73584 | Priority number, date | EP20170189228 | 04.09.2017 Original published format: EP 17189228 | [2020/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019043217 | Date: | 07.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3679027 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/14, A61K31/4709, A61K31/5517, C07D401/04, C07D401/12, C07D235/26, C07D403/04, C07D403/06, C07D403/14, C07D417/04, C07D487/04, C07D495/14, C07D519/00 | [2020/29] | CPC: |
C07D235/26 (EP,CN,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,CN);
C07D471/04 (CN,US);
A61P35/00 (CN);
C07D401/04 (EP,CN);
C07D401/06 (CN);
C07D401/10 (US);
C07D401/14 (EP,CN,US);
C07D403/04 (EP,CN);
C07D403/06 (EP,CN);
C07D403/10 (US);
C07D403/12 (CN);
C07D403/14 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (CN,US);
C07D405/14 (US);
C07D417/04 (EP,CN);
C07D417/10 (US);
C07D487/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/29] | Title | German: | DIHYDROBENZIMIDAZOLONE | [2020/29] | English: | DIHYDROBENZIMIDAZOLONES | [2020/29] | French: | DIHYDROBENZIMIDAZOLONES | [2020/29] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/29] | 26.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0385850 (UNION PHARMA SCIENT APPL [FR]); | [X]WO0192239 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US], et al); | [XI]US2003092749 (DOMBROSKI MARK A [US], et al); | [X]WO2005060967 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2007065518 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al); | [X]WO2009135651 (UNIV SAARLANDES [DE], et al); | [XA]WO2010085684 (RIGEL PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2010130794 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [XA]WO2011035124 (UNIV MICHIGAN [US], et al); | [X]WO2011130628 (CURIS INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2011156245 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al); | [X]WO2012021382 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al); | [X]WO2012174199 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al); | [XI]US2016008356 (HEGE KRISTEN MAE [US]); | [X]WO2016176460 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE]); | [X]WO2016176449 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE]); | [X]WO2017046318 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al); | by applicant | EP0385850 | WO0020358 | WO02072576 | EP1256578 | WO2004108133 | WO2005060967 | WO2005113489 | WO2006058338 | WO2007041598 | WO2007065518 | WO2009050232 | WO2009135651 | WO2010023161 | WO2010085684 | WO2010108187 | WO2010130794 | WO2011035124 | WO2011130628 | WO2011156245 | WO2012021382 | WO2012061708 | WO2012174199 | WO2013020557 | WO2013063560 | WO2013106643 | WO2014134240 | WO2015160845 | WO2016011906 | WO2016040508 | WO2016105518 | WO2016176460 | WO2016176449 | WO2017007612 | WO2017024318 | WO2017046318 | WO2017117473 |