EP3665414 - SEALED AND THERMALLY INSULATING TANK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.02.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gaztransport et Technigaz 1 Route de Versailles 78470 Saint-Rémy-lès-Chevreuse / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/25] | For all designated states Gaztransport et Technigaz 1 route de Versailles 78470 Saint Rémy les Chevreuse / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOYEAU, Marc GAZTRANSPORT ET TECHNIGAZ 1 route de Versailles 78470 Saint Remy Les Chevreuse / FR | 02 /
HERRY, Mickaël GAZTRANSPORT ET TECHNIGAZ 1 route de Versailles 78470 Saint Remy Les Chevreuse / FR | 03 /
PHILIPPE, Antoine GAZTRANSPORT ET TECHNIGAZ 1 route de Versailles 78470 Saint Remy Les Chevreuse / FR | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | Loyer & Abello 9, rue Anatole de la Forge 75017 Paris / FR | [2020/25] | Application number, filing date | 18762375.6 | 03.08.2018 | [2020/25] | WO2018FR52023 | Priority number, date | FR20170057556 | 07.08.2017 Original published format: FR 1757556 | [2020/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019030448 | Date: | 14.02.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3665414 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3665414 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F17C3/02 | [2020/25] | CPC: |
F17C3/027 (EP,KR);
F17C3/02 (RU);
F17C2201/0157 (EP,KR);
F17C2201/052 (EP,KR);
F17C2221/033 (EP,KR);
F17C2223/0161 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABGEDICHTETER UND WÄRMEISOLIERENDER TANK | [2020/25] | English: | SEALED AND THERMALLY INSULATING TANK | [2020/25] | French: | CUVE ETANCHE ET THERMIQUEMENT ISOLANTE | [2020/25] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/25] | 03.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.08.2018 | AL | 24.03.2021 | AT | 24.03.2021 | CY | 24.03.2021 | CZ | 24.03.2021 | DK | 24.03.2021 | EE | 24.03.2021 | FI | 24.03.2021 | HR | 24.03.2021 | LT | 24.03.2021 | LV | 24.03.2021 | MC | 24.03.2021 | MK | 24.03.2021 | NL | 24.03.2021 | PL | 24.03.2021 | RO | 24.03.2021 | RS | 24.03.2021 | SE | 24.03.2021 | SI | 24.03.2021 | SK | 24.03.2021 | SM | 24.03.2021 | TR | 24.03.2021 | BG | 24.06.2021 | GR | 25.06.2021 | IS | 24.07.2021 | PT | 26.07.2021 | IE | 03.08.2021 | LU | 03.08.2021 | BE | 31.08.2021 | CH | 31.08.2021 | LI | 31.08.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 03.08.2018 | |
AL | 24.03.2021 | ||
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CY | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
MK | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
IE | 03.08.2021 | ||
LU | 03.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/41] | HU | 03.08.2018 | |
AL | 24.03.2021 | ||
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CY | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
IE | 03.08.2021 | ||
LU | 03.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 03.08.2018 | |
AL | 24.03.2021 | ||
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CY | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
IE | 03.08.2021 | ||
LU | 03.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CY | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
IE | 03.08.2021 | ||
LU | 03.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
IE | 03.08.2021 | ||
LU | 03.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
LU | 03.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
LU | 03.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 24.03.2021 | |
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 24.03.2021 | |
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 24.03.2021 | |
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 24.03.2021 | |
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 24.03.2021 | |
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 24.03.2021 | |
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | FI | 24.03.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2014167228 (GAZTRANSP ET TECHNIGAZ [FR]) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-12 *; | [A]KR20160009744 (SAMSUNG HEAVY IND [KR]) [A] 1-12* figures 1-8 *; | [A]KR20170042873 (DAEWOO SHIPBUILDING & MARINE [KR]) [A] 1-12 * figures 1-10 * | by applicant | FR2691520 | WO2014057221 | WO2017006044 |