EP3681681 - DEVICE FOR PREPARING SANDWICHES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nalex 132 Route de Nice 06560 Valbonne / FR | [2020/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAIN, Alexis 132 Route de Nice 06560 Valbonne / FR | [2020/30] | Representative(s) | Macquet, Christophe Macquet & Associés Arche des Dolines 7, rue Soutrane 06560 Sophia Antipolis / FR | [2020/30] | Application number, filing date | 18762881.3 | 11.09.2018 | [2020/30] | WO2018EP74373 | Priority number, date | FR20170058354 | 11.09.2017 Original published format: FR 1758354 | [2020/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019048687 | Date: | 14.03.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3681681 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B26D3/30, B26D7/01, A21C15/00, A21D13/30 | [2020/30] | CPC: |
B26D3/30 (EP);
A21C15/007 (EP);
A21D13/30 (EP);
B26D7/01 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE ZUBEREITUNG VON SANDWICHES | [2021/19] | English: | DEVICE FOR PREPARING SANDWICHES | [2020/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRÉPARATION DE SANDWICHS | [2020/30] |
Former [2020/30] | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ZUBEREITUNG VON SANDWICHES | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/30] | 10.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/07] | 29.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2021 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]FR2955016 (BARDE JACQUES [FR]) [AD] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [AD]FR2891721 (LAFFARGUE CHRISTIAN ROBERT [FR]) [AD] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [AD]US2784682 (CLEVENGER HERBERT C) [AD] 1-14 * the whole document * | by applicant | FR2955016 | FR2891721 | FR2607051 | FR2645064 |