EP3669215 - IDENTIFYING HYDROCARBON PRODUCTION ZONES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saudi Arabian Oil Company 1 Eastern Avenue Dhahran 31311 / SA | [2020/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LU, Feng Hu Saudi Aramco P.O. Box 1424 Dhahran 31311 / SA | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/26] | Conroy, John Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18762969.6 | 14.08.2018 | [2020/26] | WO2018US46598 | Priority number, date | US201762545280P | 14.08.2017 Original published format: US 201762545280 P | [2020/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019036404 | Date: | 21.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3669215 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01V9/00, G01N33/24 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
G01N33/24 (EP,US);
G01K3/14 (US);
G01N33/241 (EP,US);
G01V9/007 (EP,US);
E21B49/0875 (US);
G01K2003/145 (US);
G01K2213/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/26] | Title | German: | IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON KOHLENWASSERSTOFFPRODUKTIONSBEREICHEN | [2020/26] | English: | IDENTIFYING HYDROCARBON PRODUCTION ZONES | [2020/26] | French: | IDENTIFICATION DE ZONES DE PRODUCTION D'HYDROCARBURES | [2020/26] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/26] | 04.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/25] | 02.02.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2022 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2013037707 (LAMBERTI WILLIAM A [US], et al) [Y] 1-15,18,19 * paragraphs [0025] , [0070] , [0089] *; | [XY]CN104933281 (CHINA PETROLEUM & CHEMICAL, et al) [X] 16 * paragraphs [0002] , [0016] , [0062] , [0082] , [0088] * [Y] 3,12-15,17; | [Y] - XI KELAI ET AL, "Diagenesis and reservoir quality of the Lower Cretaceous Quantou Formation tight sandstones in the southern Songliao Basin, China", SEDIMENTARY GEOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20151030), vol. 330, doi:10.1016/J.SEDGEO.2015.10.007, ISSN 0037-0738, pages 90 - 107, XP029314878 [Y] 1-15,17-19 * abstract * * Sections: 3. Databases and methods; 5.3 Paragenetic sequence of diagenesis * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.sedgeo.2015.10.007 | [Y] - HORITA JUSKE ED - NORMAN MARC, "Oxygen and carbon isotope fractionation in the system dolomite-water-CO2to elevated temp", GEOCHIMICA ET COSMOCHIMICA ACTA, (20140103), vol. 129, doi:10.1016/J.GCA.2013.12.027, ISSN 0016-7037, pages 111 - 124, XP028623518 [Y] 5,6 * Sections: 3.1 Dolomite-water; 3.3 Dolomite-calcite * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.gca.2013.12.027 |