EP3592921 - FORMWORK SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CSR Building Products Limited Triniti 3, 39 Delhi Rd North Ryde NSW 2113 / AU | [2024/36] |
Former [2020/03] | For all designated states CSR Building Products Limited Triniti 3, 39 Delhi Rd North Ryde NSW 2113 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DARWELL, Stephen W. c/o CSR Building Products Limited Triniti 3 39 Delhi Road North Ryde, New South Wales 2113 / AU | [2024/36] |
Former [2020/03] | 01 /
DARWELL, Stephen W c/o CSR Building Products Limited Triniti 3 39 Delhi Road North Ryde, New South Wales 2113 / AU | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2020/03] | Application number, filing date | 18763455.5 | 06.03.2018 | [2020/03] | WO2018AU50203 | Priority number, date | AU20170900766 | 06.03.2017 Original published format: AU 2017900766 | [2020/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018161115 | Date: | 13.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3592921 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3592921 | Date: | 04.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 13.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E04B2/86 | [2020/21] | CPC: |
E04B2/8629 (EP,US);
E04B2/8647 (US);
E04B2/8652 (US);
E04B2002/867 (EP,US);
E04B2002/8676 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/03] | E04G17/00, E04B2/84, E04G11/00, E04B1/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHALUNGSSYSTEM | [2020/03] | English: | FORMWORK SYSTEM | [2020/03] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COFFRAGE | [2020/03] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 01.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/03] | 21.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CA2329358 (WEMHOF J BEN [CA], et al); | [X]WO2013075250 (CFS CONCRETE FORMING SYSTEMS INC [CA]) | International search | [A]US2015275531 (ALCALA ORDAZ RICARDO [MX]); | [A]WO2016154670 (AMBE ENG PTY LTD [AU]) | by applicant | CA2329358 | WO2013075250 |