EP3593883 - ELECTRET-TREATED SHEET AND FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.07.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yupo Corporation 3, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0062 / JP | [2020/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGAMATA, Yutaro c/o YUPO CORPORATION KASHIMA FACTORY 23 Touwada Kamisu-shi Ibaraki 314-0102 / JP | 02 /
KOIKE, Hiroshi c/o YUPO CORPORATION KASHIMA FACTORY 23 Touwada Kamisu-shi Ibaraki 314-0102 / JP | 03 /
IIDA, Seiichiro c/o YUPO CORPORATION 3 Kandasurugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0062 / JP | [2020/03] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2020/03] | Application number, filing date | 18763935.6 | 07.03.2018 | [2020/03] | WO2018JP08877 | Priority number, date | JP20170046213 | 10.03.2017 Original published format: JP 2017046213 | [2020/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018164207 | Date: | 13.09.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3593883 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B23B3/28, B32B5/18, B32B7/12, B32B23/04, B32B23/08, B32B25/04, B32B27/06, B32B27/32, B32B27/30, B03C3/28, B32B25/08, B32B27/08, B32B27/18, B32B27/20, H01G7/02, B01D39/16 | [2024/31] | CPC: |
B01D39/1692 (EP,US);
B01D46/0032 (US);
B03C3/28 (EP,US);
B32B23/048 (EP);
B32B23/08 (EP);
B32B25/045 (EP);
B32B25/08 (EP);
B32B25/14 (EP);
B32B27/065 (EP);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/16 (EP,US);
B32B27/18 (EP);
B32B27/205 (EP);
B32B27/304 (EP);
B32B27/306 (EP);
B32B27/308 (EP);
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B32B27/322 (EP);
B32B27/34 (EP);
B32B27/36 (EP);
B32B27/365 (EP);
B32B27/38 (EP);
B32B27/40 (EP);
B32B27/42 (EP);
B32B3/28 (EP);
B32B5/18 (EP);
B32B7/12 (EP);
H01G7/02 (EP,US);
H01G7/021 (EP);
H01G7/028 (EP);
B01D2239/0435 (EP,US);
B01D2239/065 (EP,US);
B01D2239/10 (US);
B01D2239/1208 (EP);
B01D2275/10 (US);
B01D2279/50 (US);
B32B2038/0028 (US);
B32B2250/03 (EP,US);
B32B2250/04 (EP);
B32B2250/05 (EP);
B32B2250/24 (US);
B32B2250/40 (EP,US);
B32B2255/10 (EP);
B32B2255/102 (EP);
B32B2255/26 (EP);
B32B2262/101 (EP);
B32B2264/025 (EP);
B32B2264/0271 (EP);
B32B2264/0285 (EP);
B32B2264/10 (EP);
B32B2264/102 (EP);
B32B2264/104 (EP);
B32B2264/107 (EP);
B32B2270/00 (EP);
B32B2307/204 (EP,US);
B32B2307/518 (EP,US);
B32B2307/546 (EP);
B32B2307/724 (EP,US);
B32B2307/732 (EP);
B32B2310/14 (US);
B32B2323/10 (US);
B32B2457/00 (EP);
B32B37/185 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/03] | B01D39/16, B03C3/28, B32B27/16, B32B27/32, H01G7/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/03] | Title | German: | ELEKTRET-BEHANDELTE FOLIE UND FILTER | [2020/03] | English: | ELECTRET-TREATED SHEET AND FILTER | [2020/03] | French: | FEUILLE TRAITÉE PAR ÉLECTRET ET FILTRE | [2020/03] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2019 | Translation filed | 10.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 10.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/03] | 10.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2011084735 (YUPO CORP); | [Y]EP2479024 (YUPO CORP [JP]); | [Y]JP2015071297 (YUPO CORP); | [Y]EP3042765 (YUPO CORP [JP]) | International search | [YA]JP2011084735 (YUPO CORP) [Y] 1-3, 6-7 * , claims 1, 8, 16, paragraphs [0014], [0031]-[0034], [0036], fig. 1 & US 2012/0177907 A1, claims 1, 8, 16, paragraphs [0028], [0069]-[0078], [0080][0081], fig. 1 & JP 2011-86924 A & WO 2011/034186 A1 & EP 2479024 A1 & CN 102630198 A * [A] 4-5; | [YA]JP2015071297 (YUPO CORP) [Y] 1-3, 6-7 * , claims, paragraphs [0012]-[0013], [0018], [0021], [0037], [0042], [0046]-[0047], [0049], [0079], [0084] & US 2016/0193814 A1, claims 1-16, paragraphs [0056]-[0059], [0070], [0077], [ 0107][0108], [0123]-[0125], [0129], [0183], [0192] & WO 2015/034019 A1 & EP 3042765 A1 & CN 105517798 A * [A] 4-5; | [YA]WO2015056724 (YUPO CORP [JP]) [Y] 6-7 * , claim 1 & US 2016/0250649 A1, claim 1 & JP 201598022 A & EP 3058999 A1 & CN 105682770 A * [A] 1-5; | [A]JP2016039275 (YUPO CORP) [A] 1-7 * (Family: none) *; | [A]JPS62196812 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-7 * (Family: none) *; | [PA]JP2017225968 (PANASONIC IP MAN CORP) [PA] 1-7 * (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2015098022 | JP2008018350 | JP2010023502 | JP2004136625 | JP2017046213 |