Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018260245 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815917317 | 09.03.2018 | US201762469949 | 10.03.2017 | US201762521646 | 19.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3593296 | Global Dossier | 19.05.2021 | A4 | EP3593296 | 15.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762469949 | 10.03.2017 | WO2018US21838 | 09.03.2018 | US201762521646 | 19.06.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018165607 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2018 | A4 | WO2018165607 | 13.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762469949 | 10.03.2017 | US201762521646 | 19.06.2017 |