EP3593296 - EVENT SCHEDULING IN A HYBRID COMPUTING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rigetti & Co, LLC 775 Heinz Avenue Berkeley CA 94710 / US | [2022/14] |
Former [2020/03] | For all designated states Rigetti & Co., Inc. 2919 Seventh Street Berkeley, California 94710 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Robert Stanley 2919 Seventh Street Berkeley, California 94710 / US | [2020/03] | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [2024/41] |
Former [2020/03] | Conroy, John Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18763996.8 | 09.03.2018 | [2020/03] | WO2018US21838 | Priority number, date | US201762469949P | 10.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762469949 P | US201762521646P | 19.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762521646 P | [2020/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018165607 | Date: | 13.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3593296 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3593296 | Date: | 09.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06N99/00, B82Y10/00, G06F9/48, G06F9/54, G06F15/76, G06N10/00 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
G06F15/76 (EP,US);
G06F9/4881 (EP,US);
G06F15/163 (US);
G06F9/542 (EP,US);
G06N10/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/03] | G06N99/00, B82Y10/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EREIGNISPLANUNG IN EINEM HYBRIDEN DATENVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM | [2020/03] | English: | EVENT SCHEDULING IN A HYBRID COMPUTING SYSTEM | [2020/03] | French: | PLANIFICATION D'ÉVÉNEMENTS DANS UN SYSTÈME INFORMATIQUE HYBRIDE | [2020/03] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 10.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/03] | 17.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2006101236 (HAN KUK-HYUN [KR]) [Y] 1-44 * See paragraphs [0030], [0061]-[0068]; and figures 2, 5-6. *; | [A]US2007239366 (HILTON JEREMY P [CA], et al) [A] 1-44* See paragraphs [0073]-[0077]; and figures 1, 7. *; | [A]US2009014714 (KOCH ROGER HILSEN [US]) [A] 1-44 * See paragraphs [0059]-[0062]; and figure 8. *; | [A]CN105164705 (MICROSOFT CORP) [A] 1-44 * See paragraphs [0017]-[0023]; and figure 1. *; | [Y]US2016267032 (RIGETTI CHAD TYLER [US], et al) [Y] 1-44 * See paragraphs [0038]-[0046], [0051], [0060], [0085], [0316]-[0321], [0359M0361]; claim 1; and figures 1-2, 23B, 28. * |