EP3592547 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONNECTING MULTI-PART CONTAINER WITH INTER-CONNECTING FEATURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.12.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eco.logic Brands Inc. 550 Carnegie Street Manteca, CA 95337 / US | [2020/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORBETT, Julie 1411 Clarendon Crescent Oakland, California 94610 / US | 02 /
RODRIGUES, Gregory 23 Midway Street Unit B San Francisco, California 94133 / US | 03 /
GRAHAM, Romeo 56 Melrose Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K1Y 3R9 / CA | 04 /
WATTERS, Robert 294 Atlantis Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K2A 1X6 / CA | 05 /
STREETS, Philip 116 Kimberwick Crescent Ottawa, Ontario K1V 1K7 / CA | 06 /
BOUCHER, Luc 169 Shepody Circle Ottawa, Ontario K1T 4J1 / CA | [2020/03] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/03] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 18764130.3 | 07.03.2018 | [2020/03] | WO2018US21314 | Priority number, date | US201762468255P | 07.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762468255 P | [2020/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018165276 | Date: | 13.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3592547 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B31B50/73, B65D5/42, B65D6/00, B65D8/00, B65D8/04, B65D13/00 | [2020/03] | CPC: |
B65D13/04 (EP,US);
B65D25/16 (US);
B31B50/73 (EP);
B65D25/18 (US);
B31B2105/00 (EP,US);
B65D11/08 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/03] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERBINDEN EINES MEHRTEILIGEN BEHÄLTERS MIT VERBINDUNGSFUNKTIONEN | [2020/03] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONNECTING MULTI-PART CONTAINER WITH INTER-CONNECTING FEATURES | [2020/03] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE LIAISON D'UN RÉCEPTACLE EN PARTIES MULTIPLES AVEC ENTITÉS D'INTERCONNEXION | [2020/03] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 27.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/03] | 09.07.2020 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 10.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 10.11.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 10.11.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.11.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 10.11.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 10.11.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.11.2021 | Decision despatched | Loss of rights: Claims | 23.07.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 23.07.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.08.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]NL6508464 (HEINRICH NICOLAUS GMBH) [X] 1,2,6-10,13,15,16,20 * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 6, paragraph 4; figures 2-6 * [I] 3-5,12,17; | [I]SE302740 (MEAD CORP [US]) [I] 1* page 3, paragraph 4 - page 4, paragraph 2; figures 1-4 *; | [XI]EP0197683 (FEDERAL PAPER BOARD CO INC [US]) [X] 1,18,19 * the whole document * [I] 3-5,12,17; | [I]US6299010 (HSU PEY-SON [TW]) [I] 1,11,14 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 22; figures 4,5,7 * | International search | [A]US3249284 (WOOD PRENTICE J) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [A]US3341908 (LOCK JOSEPH H) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [XY]US5415613 (MCGRATH STEPHEN E [CA]) [X] 1, 8-11, 13, 14, 16-18 * entire document * [Y] 12; | [A]US5940935 (JULIUS ZACHARY [US]) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [Y]US2007194022 (HUGGETT ANTHONY C [ZA]) [Y] 12 * entire document * |