EP3526909 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR COVARIANCE MATRIX FEEDBACK IN ADVANCED WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.04.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2019/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAHMAN, Md Saifur 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
ONGGOSANUSI, Eko 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / US | [2019/34] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2019/34] | Application number, filing date | 18764335.8 | 09.03.2018 | [2019/34] | WO2018KR02840 | Priority number, date | US201762469143P | 09.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762469143 P | US201815913615 | 06.03.2018 Original published format: US201815913615 | [2019/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018164537 | Date: | 13.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3526909 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06, H04B7/0456, H04L25/02 | [2019/43] | CPC: |
H04B7/0626 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0452 (US);
H04B7/0478 (EP,US);
H04B7/0639 (KR,US);
H04L25/021 (EP,US);
H04L25/0242 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/34] | H04B7/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR KOVARIANSMATRIX-FEEDBACK IN FROTSCHRITTLICHEN DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEMEN | [2019/34] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR COVARIANCE MATRIX FEEDBACK IN ADVANCED WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS | [2019/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE RÉTROACTION DE MATRICE DE COVARIANCE DANS DES SYSTÈMES DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL ÉVOLUÉS | [2019/34] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 17.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 19.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - INTEL CORPORATION, "On NR Type II category 2 codebook", vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens, Greece; 20170213 - 20170217, (20170212), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1702206 ON NR TYPE II CATEGORY 2 CODEBOOK, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170212), XP051209364 [X] 1,2,5-8,11-13 * Sections 1, 2 and 2.1; page 1 - page 2 * [Y] 3,4,9,10,14,15 | [Y] - ERICSSON, "Category 1 Type II CSI Codebook", vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens, Greece; 20170213 - 20170217, (20170212), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1702685, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170212), XP051209832 [Y] 3,9,14,15 * Sections 3 and 3.1; page 2 - page 3 * | [Y] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "Discussion on advanced CSI for Class B and hybrid CSI-RS", vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens, Greece; 20170213 - 20170217, (20170212), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1702535, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170212), XP051209689 [Y] 4,10,14 * Section 3, option 2; page 2 - page 3 * | International search | [A]US2014112406 (ZHU YUAN [CN], et al) [A] 1-15* See paragraph [0053]; and figure 6. *; | [A] - "CSI Feedback Type II for NR MIMO", R1-1702843 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #88, (20170207), XP051221670 [A] 1-15 * See section 2. * | [A] - "On NR Type II category 2 codebook", Rl-1702206, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #88, (20170207), XP051221114 [A] 1-15 * See section 2. * | [A] - NOKIA et al., "On Type II CSI Feedback in NR", R1-1703175, 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1 Meeting #88, (20170206), XP051220400 [A] 1-15 * See sections 2, 3. * | [A] - ZTE et al., "Linear combination based CSI feedback design for NR MIMO", Rl-1701809, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #88, (20170207), XP051220875 [A] 1-15 * See section 2. * | by applicant | - "E-UTRA, Physical channels and modulation", 3GPP TS 36.211 | - "E-UTRA, Multiplexing and Channel coding", 3GPP TS 36.212 | - "E-UTRA, Physical Layer Procedures", 3GPP TS 36.213 | - "E-UTRA, Medium Access Control (MAC) protocol specification", 3GPP TS 36.321 | - "E-UTRA, Radio Resource Control (RRC) protocol specification", 3GPP TS 36.331 | - "Feasibility Study on New Services and Markets Technology Enablers", 3GPP TR 22.891 |