EP3609013 - ELECTROLYTE SOLUTION FOR ALKALI METAL-SULFUR-BASED SECONDARY BATTERY, AND ALKALI METAL-SULFUR-BASED SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The School Corporation Kansai University 3-3-35 Yamate-cho Suita-shi, Osaka 564-8680 / JP | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Osaka Umeda Twin Towers South, 1-13-1 Umeda, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | [2023/03] |
Former [2020/07] | For all designated states The School Corporation Kansai University 3-3-35 Yamate-cho Suita-shi, Osaka 564-8680 / JP | ||
For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIKAWA, Masashi c/o Faculty of Chemistry Materials and Bioengineering THE SCHOOL CORPORATION KANSAI UNIVERSITY 3-3-35 Yamate-cho Suita-shi Osaka 564-8680 / JP | 02 /
TORII, Yuya c/o Graduate School of Science and Engineering THE SCHOOL CORPORATION KANSAI UNIVERSITY 3-3-35 Yamate-cho Suita-shi Osaka 564-8680 / JP | 03 /
UCHIDA, Satoshi c/o Organization for Research and Development of Innovative Science and Technology THE SCHOOL CORPORATION KANSAI UNIVERSITY 3-3-35 Yamate-cho Suita-shi Osaka 564-8680 / JP | 04 /
YAMAGATA, Masaki c/o Faculty of Chemistry Materials and Bioengineering THE SCHOOL CORPORATION KANSAI UNIVERSITY 3-3-35 Yamate-cho Suita-shi Osaka 564-8680 / JP | 05 /
YAMAZAKI, Shigeaki c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome Kita-ku Osaka-Shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 06 /
KINOSHITA, Shinichi c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome Kita-ku Osaka-Shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2020/07] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/07] | Application number, filing date | 18764388.7 | 19.02.2018 | [2020/07] | WO2018JP05770 | Priority number, date | JP20170043858 | 08.03.2017 Original published format: JP 2017043858 | [2020/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018163778 | Date: | 13.09.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3609013 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/0569, H01M10/052, H01M4/38, H01M4/13, H01M4/62 | [2021/10] | CPC: |
H01M4/382 (EP);
H01M10/0569 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/052 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/13 (EP);
H01M4/362 (KR);
H01M4/38 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/625 (EP,KR);
H01M2300/0034 (EP);
H01M2300/0037 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/07] | H01M10/0569, H01M4/36, H01M4/38, H01M10/052 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/07] | Title | German: | ELEKTROLYTLÖSUNG FÜR ALKALIMETALL-SCHWEFEL-BASIERTE SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE UND ALKALIMETALL-SCHWEFEL-BASIERTE SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE | [2020/07] | English: | ELECTROLYTE SOLUTION FOR ALKALI METAL-SULFUR-BASED SECONDARY BATTERY, AND ALKALI METAL-SULFUR-BASED SECONDARY BATTERY | [2020/07] | French: | SOLUTION ÉLECTROLYTIQUE POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE MÉTAL ALCALIN SOUFRE, ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE MÉTAL ALCALIN - SOUFRE | [2020/07] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2019 | Translation filed | 06.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 06.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/07] | 13.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010062344 (KOH MEITEN [JP], et al) [X] 1,2* paragraph [0132]; example 30; table 2 *; | [XD]JP2013225497 (NAT UNIV YOKOHAMA) [XD] 1,3,6 * paragraphs [0030] , [0040]; claim 1 *; | [X]JP2016100094 (UNIV KANSAI) [X] 1,3-6 * example 1 * | International search | [Y]WO2008096729 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 2, 5 * , *; | [Y]JP2008218387 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [Y] 2, 5 * , *; | [A]JP2010095390 (TOKYO INST TECH) [A] 1-7 * , *; | [A]JP2012178339 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [A] 1-7 * , *; | [A]WO2015166636 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7* , *; | [A]WO2016075916 (GS YUASA INT LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7 * , *; | [XY]JP2016100094 (UNIV KANSAI) [X] 1, 3, 4, 6,7 * , * [Y] 2, 5; | [A]JP2016115417 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * , * | by applicant | JPS584557B | JP2005108724 | JP2010095390 | JP2013225497 |