EP3592770 - HUMAN MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES TO STAPHYLOCOCCUS AUREUS LUKAB TOXIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.01.2022 [2022/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vanderbilt University 305 Kirkland Hall 2201 West End Avenue Nashville, TN 37240 / US | [2020/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CROWE, James, E. 2101 20th Ave. South Nashville, TN 37212-4311 / US | 02 /
SAPPARAPU, Gopal c/o Vanderbilt University 336-C Olin Hall Vu Station B Nashville, TN 37240 / US | 03 /
THOMSEN, Isaac c/o Vanderbilt University 336-C Olin Hall Vu Station B Nashville, TN 37240 / US | 04 /
CREECH, Buddy c/o Vanderbilt University 336-C Olin Hall Vu Station B Nashville, TN 37240 / US | [2020/03] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/03] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 18764566.8 | 06.03.2018 | [2020/03] | WO2018US21041 | Priority number, date | US201762467619P | 06.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762467619 P | [2020/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018165089 | Date: | 13.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3592770 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/12, G01N33/569, A61K39/085, // A61K39/00 | [2020/51] | CPC: |
G01N33/56938 (EP,US);
C07K16/1271 (EP,US);
A61K39/085 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP,US);
C12N5/163 (EP,US);
G01N33/577 (US);
A61K2039/505 (EP);
C07K2317/21 (EP,US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/03] | C07K16/12, G01N33/569 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/03] | Title | German: | HUMANE MONOKLONALE ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN LUKAB-TOXIN VON STAPHYLOCOCCUS AUREUS | [2020/03] | English: | HUMAN MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES TO STAPHYLOCOCCUS AUREUS LUKAB TOXIN | [2020/03] | French: | ANTICORPS MONOCLONAUX HUMAINS DIRIGÉS CONTRE LA TOXINE LUKAB DU STAPHYLOCOCCUS AUREUS | [2020/03] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/03] | 19.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2014187746 (ARSANIS BIOSCIENCES GMBH [AT]) [X] 15 * the whole document * [A] 1-14; | [XA]WO2015091935 (ARSANIS BIOSCIENCES GMBH [AT]) [X] 15 * the whole document * [A] 1-14; | [A] - THOMSEN ISAAC P ET AL, "Children with invasive Staphylococcus aureus disease exhibit a potently neutralizing antibody response to the cytotoxin LukAB", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, vol. 82, no. 3, doi:10.1128/IAI.01558-13, ISSN 1098-5522, (20140301), pages 1234 - 1242, (20131230), XP009179653 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/IAI.01558-13 | [A] - MELEHANI J.H. ET AL., "Staphylococcus aureus Leukocidin A/B(LukAB) Kills Human Monocytes via HostNLRP3 and ASC when Extracellular, but NotIntracellular", PLOS PATHOGENS, (20150612), vol. 11, no. 6, XP002800931 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.ppat.1004970 | [L] - THOMSEN I.P. ET AL., "Monoclonal Antibodies Against the Staphylococcus aureusBicomponent Leukotoxin AB Isolated Following InvasiveHuman Infection Reveal Diverse Binding and Modes ofAction", J. INFECTIOUS DIS., (20170401), vol. 215, pages 1124 - 1131, XP002800932 [L] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US2011274693 (TORRES VICTOR J [US], et al) [X] 08 * entire document *; | [A]US2016244511 (NAGY ESZTER [AT], et al) [A] 1, 2, 13, 26-32, 36-42, 47-53, 58, 68 * entire document *; | [A]CN104098693 (INST BIOENGINEERING AMMS) [A] 1, 2, 13, 26-32, 36-42, 47-53, 58, 68 * entire document; see machine translation *; | [A]US8343489 (WEAVER DAVID T [US], et al) [A] 1, 2, 13, 26-32, 36-42, 47-53, 58, 68 * entire document *; | [A]WO2004050850 (ABGENIX INC [US], et al) [A] 1, 2, 13, 26-32, 36-42, 47-53, 58, 68 * entire document *; | [A]US2014030269 (COLJEE VINCENT W [US]) [A] 1, 2, 13, 26-32, 36-42, 47-53, 58, 68 * entire document *; | [A]WO2016197071 (UNIV NEW YORK [US], et al) [A] 1, 2, 13, 26-32, 36-42, 47-53, 58, 68 * entire document * |