EP3692267 - CONNECTOR FOR BUTT CONNECTING TWO COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/33] | CONNECTOR FOR BUTT-CONNECTING TWO COMPONENTS | ||
[2021/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.04.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Häfele SE & Co KG Adolf-Häfele-Strasse 1 72202 Nagold / DE | [2021/10] |
Former [2020/33] | For all designated states Häfele GmbH & Co KG Adolf-Häfele-Strasse 1 72202 Nagold / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VON WILCKE, Michael Karl-Marx-Str. 109 16547 Birkenwerder / DE | 02 /
LEISTERT, Peer Waldstrasse 72 15566 Schöneiche / DE | 03 /
SAWATZKI, Gerd Chausseestraße 58 15518 Rauen / DE | 04 /
NITSCHMANN, Gunter Gottlieb-Henssler-Str. 18 72285 Pfalzgrafenweiler / DE | [2020/33] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/33] | Application number, filing date | 18765096.5 | 03.09.2018 | [2020/33] | WO2018EP73602 | Priority number, date | DE201720106045U | 05.10.2017 Original published format: DE 202017106045 U | [2020/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019068401 | Date: | 11.04.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3692267 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3692267 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16B5/00, F16B12/20, F16B12/26, F16B13/12, F16B21/08 | [2020/33] | CPC: |
F16B5/0024 (EP);
F16B33/02 (US);
F16B12/20 (EP);
F16B12/24 (US);
F16B12/26 (EP);
F16B21/082 (EP);
F16B13/128 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDER ZUM STOSSVERBINDEN ZWEIER BAUTEILE | [2021/45] | English: | CONNECTOR FOR BUTT CONNECTING TWO COMPONENTS | [2021/45] | French: | RACCORDEMENT SERVANT À RÉALISER UN ABOUTAGE DE DEUX PIÈCES | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/33] | VERBINDER ZUM STOßVERBINDEN ZWEIER BAUTEILE | ||
Former [2020/33] | CONNECTOR FOR BUTT-CONNECTING TWO COMPONENTS | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/33] | 06.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.09.2018 | AL | 20.04.2022 | CY | 20.04.2022 | CZ | 20.04.2022 | EE | 20.04.2022 | ES | 20.04.2022 | FI | 20.04.2022 | HR | 20.04.2022 | LT | 20.04.2022 | LV | 20.04.2022 | MC | 20.04.2022 | MK | 20.04.2022 | NL | 20.04.2022 | RO | 20.04.2022 | RS | 20.04.2022 | SI | 20.04.2022 | SK | 20.04.2022 | SM | 20.04.2022 | BG | 20.07.2022 | NO | 20.07.2022 | GR | 21.07.2022 | IS | 20.08.2022 | PT | 22.08.2022 | IE | 03.09.2022 | LU | 03.09.2022 | BE | 30.09.2022 | CH | 30.09.2022 | LI | 30.09.2022 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/24] | HU | 03.09.2018 | |
AL | 20.04.2022 | ||
CY | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
IE | 03.09.2022 | ||
LU | 03.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
CY | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
IE | 03.09.2022 | ||
LU | 03.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
IE | 03.09.2022 | ||
LU | 03.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
IE | 03.09.2022 | ||
LU | 03.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
IE | 03.09.2022 | ||
LU | 03.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
LU | 03.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | CZ | 20.04.2022 | |
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | ES | 20.04.2022 | |
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | ES | 20.04.2022 | |
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | ES | 20.04.2022 | |
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | ES | 20.04.2022 | |
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 20.04.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE20007389U (HABER HORST [DE], et al) [A] 1-13* figure - *; | [A]US6299397 (MENGEL CRAIG [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]DE202014002242U (CONFITT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [AD]DE202016102176U (HÄFELE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [AD] 1-13 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0055]; figure - * | by applicant | DE202016102176U |