EP3672990 - B7-H4 ANTIBODIES AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | First examination report | 12.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Five Prime Therapeutics, Inc. 111 Oyster Point Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2020/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAPLAN, Charles c/o Five Prime Therapeutics Inc. 111 Oyster Point Boulevard South San Francisco California 94080 / US | 02 /
HOUSER, Derrick c/o Five Prime Therapeutics Inc. 111 Oyster Boulevard South San Francisco California 94080 / US | 03 /
BORGES, Luis c/o Five Prime Therapeutics Inc. 111 Oyster Point Boulevard South San Francisco California 94080 / US | 04 /
BRATTICH, Gloria c/o Five Prime Therapeutics Inc. 111 Oyster Point Boulevard South San Francisco California 94080 / US | 05 /
BELLOVIN, David c/o Five Prime Therapeutics Inc. 111 Oyster Point Boulevard South San Francisco California 94080 / US | 06 /
KEMP, Felicia c/o Five Prime Therapeutics Inc. 111 Oyster Point Boulevard South San Francisco California 94080 / US | 07 /
GHODDUSI, Majid c/o Five Prime Therapeutics Inc. 111 Oyster Point Boulevard South San Francisco California 94080 / US | 08 /
NIELSON, Nels P. c/o Adimab LLC 7 Lucent Drive Lebanon New Hampshire 03766 / US | 09 /
MILLER, Kathy c/o Five Prime Therapeutics Inc. 111 Oyster Point Boulevard South San Francisco California 94080 / US | 10 /
SCHMIDT, Maike c/o Five Prime Therapeutics Inc. 111 Oyster Point Boulevard South San Francisco California 94080 / US | [2020/27] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2020/27] | Application number, filing date | 18765313.4 | 23.08.2018 | [2020/27] | WO2018US47805 | Priority number, date | US201762550173P | 25.08.2017 Original published format: US 201762550173 P | US201762579774P | 31.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762579774 P | US201762607810P | 19.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762607810 P | US201862656789P | 12.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862656789 P | [2020/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019040780 | Date: | 28.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3672990 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61P35/00 | [2020/27] | CPC: |
C07K16/2827 (EP,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR,US);
C07K16/2818 (EP,US);
G01N33/57492 (US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/507 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/24 (US);
C07K2317/40 (US);
C07K2317/41 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/52 (US);
C07K2317/56 (US);
C07K2317/565 (US);
C07K2317/73 (US);
C07K2317/732 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/74 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/75 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/92 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/27] | Validation states | MA | 24.03.2020 | Title | German: | B7-H4-ANTIKÖRPER UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2020/27] | English: | B7-H4 ANTIBODIES AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2020/27] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI-B7-H4 ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2020/27] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/27] | 22.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2014100483 (AMPLIMMUNE INC [US], et al); | by applicant | WO8605807 | WO8901036 | WO9002809 | WO9110737 | WO9201047 | US5122464 | WO9218619 | WO9311236 | US5223409 | US5225539 | WO9429351 | US5403484 | WO9515982 | US5427908 | WO9520401 | US5516637 | US5571698 | US5580717 | US5585097 | WO9713844 | US5624821 | US5648260 | US5658727 | WO9734631 | US5677425 | US5693780 | US5698426 | US5733743 | US5750753 | WO9823289 | US5780225 | US5807715 | US5821047 | US5869046 | US5965726 | US5969108 | WO9954342 | WO0042072 | US6121022 | WO0061739 | US6165745 | US6174666 | US6194551 | WO0129246 | US6277375 | US6291664 | WO0231140 | WO0230954 | US6414132 | WO02060919 | WO03011878 | US6602684 | US2004014194 | US6737056 | WO2004065540 | US6794498 | US6946292 | WO2006105021 | US2006253928 | WO2007005874 | WO2007039818 | US7214775 | US2007178551 | US2007248600 | US2008060092 | WO2009009116 | WO2009036379 | US7658921 | US7709226 | WO2010105256 | WO2011028683 | WO2012009568 | US8182813 | US8206715 | US8263079 | WO2012130831 | WO2012145493 | WO2013079174 | US8513199 | US8591886 | WO2015017600 | WO2015031667 | US9221910 | WO2017015623 | WO2017079117 | WO1991GB01134 |