EP3668537 - T CELL MODIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adaptimmune Ltd 60 Jubilee Avenue Milton Park Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX14 4RX / GB | [2020/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMILTON, Garth Adaptimmune Ltd 60 Jubilee Avenue Milton Park Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 4RX / GB | 02 /
SILK, Jonathan Adaptimmune Ltd 60 Jubilee Avenue Milton Park Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 4RX / GB | 03 /
GUEGUEN, Claire Adaptimmune Ltd 60 Jubilee Avenue Milton Park Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 4RX / GB | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2020/26] | Application number, filing date | 18766130.1 | 15.08.2018 | [2020/26] | WO2018EP72148 | Priority number, date | GB20170013078 | 15.08.2017 Original published format: GB 201713078 | [2020/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2019034703 | Date: | 21.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3668537 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, C07K16/30, C07K14/54, C07K14/47, C07K14/725, A61P35/00 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,KR,US);
C07K14/4748 (EP,KR,US);
C07K16/2833 (KR,US);
A61K39/0011 (KR);
A61K39/4611 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/4631 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/4632 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/464481 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/464486 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/464488 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/464489 (EP,KR,US);
C07K14/5418 (EP,KR,US);
C07K14/7051 (EP,KR,US);
C07K16/244 (KR,US);
C07K16/30 (EP,KR,US);
C12N5/0636 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/5156 (KR);
A61K2039/5158 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/26] | Title | German: | T-ZELL-MODIFIKATION | [2020/26] | English: | T CELL MODIFICATION | [2020/26] | French: | MODIFICATION DE LYMPHOCYTES T | [2020/26] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/26] | 02.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2016126608 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [XP]WO2018050225 (YU DI [SE], et al); | by applicant | WO9220356 | WO9405304 | WO9423031 | WO9520974 | WO9523874 | WO9626214 | WO0020581 |