EP3669120 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR HEAT RECOVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.07.2024 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | [2020/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROPS, Cornelius Maria c/o TNO IP&Contracting Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2020/26] | Application number, filing date | 18766381.0 | 17.08.2018 | [2020/26] | WO2018NL50544 | Priority number, date | EP20170186877 | 18.08.2017 Original published format: EP 17186877 | EP20180152746 | 22.01.2018 Original published format: EP 18152746 | [2020/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019035714 | Date: | 21.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3669120 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F22B37/10, F01K23/10, F22B1/18, F01K15/02, F01K25/08 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
F22B37/10 (EP);
F01K23/10 (EP,US);
F01K25/08 (EP,US);
F22B1/1807 (EP,US);
F01K15/02 (EP);
Y02E20/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/26] | Title | German: | WÄRMERÜCKGEWINNUNGSVERFAHREN UND SYSTEM | [2024/29] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR HEAT RECOVERY | [2020/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE RÉCUPÉRATION DE CHALEUR | [2020/26] |
Former [2020/26] | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR WÄRMERÜCKGEWINNUNG | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/26] | 20.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M24) | 25.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3576179 (ROMANOS NICHOLAS D); | [XAI]EP0919767 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [CH]); | [A]US2010059216 (BRUCKMANN WILHELM [DE], et al); | [XAI]US2014041839 (JACKSON BRADLEY N [US]) | by applicant | EP0919767 | US2011000624 | US2014041839 |