EP3668715 - PROCESS TO FORM A TILE USING LOW TEMPERATURE HEAT LAMINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2020/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HU, Yushan 230 Abner Jackson Parkway Lake Jackson TX 77566 / US | 02 /
WEEKS, Ronald, J. 230 Abner Jackson Parkway Lake Jackson TX 77566 / US | 03 /
JABLONKA, Mark, T. 230 Abner Jackson Parkway Lake Jackson TX 77566 / US | 04 /
LIU, Lizhi 230 Abner Jackson Parkway Lake Jackson TX 77566 / US | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2020/26] | Application number, filing date | 18766408.1 | 16.08.2018 | [2020/26] | WO2018US00175 | Priority number, date | US201762546178P | 16.08.2017 Original published format: US 201762546178 P | [2020/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019035907 | Date: | 21.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3668715 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3668715 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B32B37/02, B32B37/04, // B32B5/02, B32B7/12, B32B27/08, B32B27/32 | [2023/16] | CPC: |
B32B33/00 (EP);
B32B37/06 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/12 (EP,US);
B32B27/16 (EP);
B32B27/18 (EP,US);
B32B27/32 (EP,KR,US);
B32B37/02 (EP);
B32B37/04 (EP);
B32B5/022 (EP,US);
B32B7/12 (EP,US);
C08L23/0815 (US);
B32B2255/10 (EP,US);
B32B2255/26 (EP);
B32B2262/101 (US);
B32B2307/4023 (EP,US);
B32B2307/514 (EP);
B32B2307/732 (EP);
B32B2309/02 (US);
B32B2323/10 (KR,US);
B32B2331/04 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/26] | B32B37/06, B32B33/00, B32B27/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER FLIESE MIT NIEDERTEMPERATUR-WÄRMEKASCHIERUNG | [2020/26] | English: | PROCESS TO FORM A TILE USING LOW TEMPERATURE HEAT LAMINATION | [2020/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION D'UN CARREAU PAR STRATIFICATION THERMIQUE À BASSE TEMPÉRATURE | [2020/26] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/26] | 13.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M04) [2021/36] | 05.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.09.2023 | CZ | 06.09.2023 | DK | 06.09.2023 | EE | 06.09.2023 | FI | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | IT | 06.09.2023 | LT | 06.09.2023 | LV | 06.09.2023 | NL | 06.09.2023 | PL | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SE | 06.09.2023 | SI | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | PT | 08.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 06.09.2023 | |
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2008103887 (MANNINGTON MILLS [US], et al) [AD] 1-13* claim - *; | [AD]WO2011156215 (MANNINGTON MILLS [US], et al) [AD] 1-13 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]WO2017003762 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0135]; figures 1,2 * | Examination | US9359773 | WO2016134243 | US2016340916 | by applicant | JPH01214429 | EP0433060 | US5158641 | GB2310631 | EP0868995 | EP0955158 | WO0151724 | EP1129844 | US2002015527 | US2007059515 | US2008026197 | WO2008103887 | US7426568 | WO2011156215 | US2012148849 | TW201416527 | EP2878440 | US2015165748 | WO2015140682 | US9359773 | WO2016US38517 |