EP3597269 - NEUTRON CAPTURE THERAPY SYSTEM AND CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.04.2020 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Heavy Industries, Ltd. 1-1 Osaki 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-6025 / JP | [2020/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUKAWA, Tetsuya c/o Yokosuka Works of Sumitomo Heavy Industries Ltd. 19 Natsushima-cho Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa 237-8555 / JP | [2020/04] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [2020/04] | Application number, filing date | 18767199.5 | 09.03.2018 | [2020/04] | WO2018JP09314 | Priority number, date | JP20170047185 | 13.03.2017 Original published format: JP 2017047185 | [2020/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018168713 | Date: | 20.09.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3597269 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/10 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
A61N5/103 (EP);
A61N5/1031 (US);
A61K41/0095 (US);
A61N5/10 (EP);
A61N5/1077 (US);
A61N2005/109 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] | Title | German: | NEUTRONENEINFANGTHERAPIESYSTEM UND STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/04] | English: | NEUTRON CAPTURE THERAPY SYSTEM AND CONTROL DEVICE | [2020/04] | French: | SYSTÈME DE THÉRAPIE PAR CAPTURE DE NEUTRONS ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE | [2020/04] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2019 | Translation filed | 05.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 05.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 21.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [XY]JP2016077812 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES) [X] 1, 4 * , paragraphs [0008]-[0046], fig. 1-2 & CN 105938731 A & TW 201634075 A * [Y] 2-3; | [Y]JP2016159107 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES, et al) [Y] 2-3 * , paragraphs [0007]-[0050], fig. 1-2 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2016214760 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-4 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A] - SAKURAI, HIDEYUKI, "Accelerator based-BNCT project of University of Tsukuba", (20161108), pages 1 - 6, URL: http://www.pref.osaka.lg.jp/attach/28090/002z649/bnctsymposiryouall-12tsukuba.pdf, XP055623010 [A] 1-4 | [A] - TAKADA, KENTA et al., "Development of Monte Carlo based real-time treatment planning system with fast calculation algorithm for boron neutron capture therapy", Physica Medica, (20160000), vol. 32, no. 12, pages 1846 - 1851, XP029861664 [A] 1-4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejmp.2016.11.007 | by applicant | JPS5410608B |