EP3597330 - METAL PASTE FOR JOINTS, ASSEMBLY, PRODUCTION METHOD FOR ASSEMBLY, SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE, AND PRODUCTION METHOD FOR SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Resonac Corporation 9-1, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7325 / JP | [2024/13] |
Former [2023/15] | For all designated states Resonac Corporation 13-9, Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2020/04] | For all designated states Hitachi Chemical Company, Ltd. 9-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6606 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWANA Yuki c/o Hitachi Chemical Company Ltd. 9-2 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6606 / JP | 02 /
NAKAKO Hideo c/o Hitachi Chemical Company Ltd. 9-2 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6606 / JP | 03 /
NEGISHI Motohiro c/o Hitachi Chemical Company Ltd. 9-2 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6606 / JP | 04 /
ISHIKAWA Dai c/o Hitachi Chemical Company Ltd. 9-2 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6606 / JP | 05 /
SUGAMA Chie c/o Hitachi Chemical Company Ltd. 9-2 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6606 / JP | 06 /
EJIRI Yoshinori c/o Hitachi Chemical Company Ltd. 9-2 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6606 / JP | [2020/04] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/04] | Beckmann, Claus Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18767237.3 | 18.01.2018 | [2020/04] | WO2018JP01442 | Priority number, date | JP20170050091 | 15.03.2017 Original published format: JP 2017050091 | [2020/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018168187 | Date: | 20.09.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3597330 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B22F1/00, B22F9/00, H01L21/52, H01L21/56, H01L23/31, B23K35/02, B23K35/30, B23K35/36, B22F7/06 | [2020/48] | CPC: |
B23K35/025 (EP,US);
H01L24/28 (KR);
B22F1/05 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/052 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/068 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/10 (EP,KR,US);
B22F3/10 (US);
B22F7/064 (EP);
B23K1/0008 (US);
B23K1/20 (US);
B23K35/302 (EP,US);
B23K35/3618 (EP,US);
C09J1/00 (KR);
H01L21/52 (KR);
H01L21/56 (EP);
H01L23/3107 (EP);
H01L23/492 (KR);
H01L23/49582 (US);
H01L24/27 (KR);
B22F2301/10 (US);
B22F2304/058 (US);
B22F2999/00 (EP);
B23K2101/40 (US);
H01L2021/60007 (KR);
H01L2224/32245 (EP,KR);
H01L2224/40245 (EP,KR);
H01L2224/40491 (EP);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,KR,US);
H01L2224/48175 (US);
H01L2224/48247 (EP,KR);
H01L2224/73221 (EP);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,KR);
H01L2224/92247 (EP,KR);
H01L23/3121 (US);
H01L23/49562 (US);
H01L24/48 (US);
H01L2924/181 (EP,KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B22F2999/00, B22F7/064, B22F3/22 (EP);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/73221, H01L2224/40245, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32245, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00012 (EP);
H01L2224/92247, H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32245, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00012 (EP);
H01L2924/181, H01L2924/00012 (EP) (-) |
Former IPC [2020/04] | B22F1/00, B22F9/00, H01L21/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] | Title | German: | METALLPASTE FÜR VERBINDUNGEN, ANORDNUNG, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR ANORDNUNG, HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT | [2020/04] | English: | METAL PASTE FOR JOINTS, ASSEMBLY, PRODUCTION METHOD FOR ASSEMBLY, SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE, AND PRODUCTION METHOD FOR SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE | [2020/04] | French: | PÂTE MÉTALLIQUE POUR LIAISON, CORPS LIÉ AINSI QUE PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CELUI-CI, ET DISPOSITIF À SEMI-CONDUCTEURS AINSI QUE PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CELUI-CI | [2020/04] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2019 | Translation filed | 01.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 01.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 12.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2013090570 (DOW CORNING [US]) [X] 11-13 * paragraphs [0047] - [0176]; figure 31a * [I] 1-10; | [XDA]JP2014167145 (UNIV OSAKA, et al) [XD] 11-13 * abstract * [A] 1-10; | [A]WO2015198022 (ALPHA METALS [US], et al) [A] 1-13* page 23, paragraph 30 - page 32, paragraph 4; examples 1-9 *; | [XA]WO2016140351 (UNIV OSAKA [JP]) [X] 11-13 * abstract * [A] 1-10; | [P]EP3266545 (UNIV OSAKA [JP]) [P] * paragraphs [0102] - [0134]; figure 1; tables 1-3 * | International search | [A]JP2013047365 (HITACHI CABLE, et al) [A] 1-13 * , *; | [A]JP2014167145 (UNIV OSAKA, et al) [A] 1-13 * , *; | [A]JP2015227476 (KYORITSU KAGAKU SANGYO) [A] 1-13* , 1-31 & US 2017/0043404 A1, , Fig. 1-31 & WO 2015/182395 A1 & EP 3150306 A1 & TW 201601993 A & KR 10-2016-0120786 A & CN 106457407 A * | by applicant | JPS4928639B | JPS506081B | JP3736797B | JP2014167145 | JP6060199B | - R. KHAZAKAL. MENDIZABALD. HENRY, J. ElecTron. Mater, (20140000), vol. 43, no. 7, pages 2459 - 2466 |