EP3598044 - METHOD FOR GENERATING SCHEDULE INFORMATION ON BASIS OF OPERATION INFORMATION, AND SERVER FOR IMPLEMENTING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/04] | METHOD FOR GENERATING SCHEDULE INFORMATION ON BASIS OF OPERATION INFORMATION, AND SERVER AND REFRIGERATOR FOR IMPLEMENTING SAME | ||
[2023/04] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2020/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HWANG, Sung Mok IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 51 Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 02 /
KWON, Young Tag IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 51 Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 03 /
JUNG, Jin-Hoon IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 51 Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | [2020/04] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2020/04] | Application number, filing date | 18767297.7 | 14.03.2018 | [2020/04] | WO2018KR03006 | Priority number, date | KR20170032697 | 15.03.2017 Original published format: KR 20170032697 | [2020/04] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018169313 | Date: | 20.09.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3598044 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3598044 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F25D29/00, G06N99/00, G06N3/08 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
G06N3/08 (EP);
F25D29/00 (EP,KR,US);
G05B13/0265 (US);
G06N20/00 (US);
G06N5/04 (US);
G06N99/00 (KR);
F25D2600/02 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/04] | F25D29/00, G06N99/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON PLANINFORMATIONEN AUF BASIS VON BETRIEBSINFORMATIONEN SOWIE SERVER ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [2023/04] | English: | METHOD FOR GENERATING SCHEDULE INFORMATION ON BASIS OF OPERATION INFORMATION, AND SERVER FOR IMPLEMENTING SAME | [2023/04] | French: | PROCESSUS DE GÉNÉRATION D'INFORMATIONS DE PLAN SUR LA BASE D'INFORMATIONS OPÉRATIONNELLES ET SERVEUR POUR LA MISE EN OEUVRE DU PROCESSUS | [2023/29] |
Former [2020/04] | VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON PLANINFORMATIONEN AUF BASIS VON BETRIEBSINFORMATIONEN SOWIE SERVER UND KÜHLSCHRANK ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DAVON | ||
Former [2020/04] | METHOD FOR GENERATING SCHEDULE INFORMATION ON BASIS OF OPERATION INFORMATION, AND SERVER AND REFRIGERATOR FOR IMPLEMENTING SAME | ||
Former [2020/04] | PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION D'INFORMATIONS DE CALENDRIER SUR LA BASE D'INFORMATIONS DE FONCTIONNEMENT, ET SERVEUR ET RÉFRIGÉRATEUR POUR LA MISE EN UVRE DE CE PROCÉDÉ | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2019 | Translation filed | 15.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 13.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.11.2023 | CZ | 22.11.2023 | DK | 22.11.2023 | EE | 22.11.2023 | ES | 22.11.2023 | HR | 22.11.2023 | IT | 22.11.2023 | LT | 22.11.2023 | LV | 22.11.2023 | NL | 22.11.2023 | PL | 22.11.2023 | RO | 22.11.2023 | RS | 22.11.2023 | SE | 22.11.2023 | SK | 22.11.2023 | SM | 22.11.2023 | BG | 22.02.2024 | NO | 22.02.2024 | GR | 23.02.2024 | IS | 22.03.2024 | PT | 22.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
CZ | 22.11.2023 | ||
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
EE | 22.11.2023 | ||
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RO | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
EE | 22.11.2023 | ||
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 22.11.2023 | |
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 23.02.2024 | |
IS | 22.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5315835 (PARK SEONG S [KR]) [A] 10-12 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2004113681 (FUJI ELECTRIC RETAIL SYSTEMS) [A] 10-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1926045 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [A] 10-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1935712 (TNO [NL]) [A] 10-12 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2011002735 (UNIV CARNEGIE MELLON [US], et al) [A] 10-12 * the whole document *; | [A]KR20120006287 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 10-12 * the whole document *; | [A]CN103578257 (HUBEI CHUJI TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 10-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US2015302510 (GODSEY SANDRA LYNN [US], et al) [A] 10-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP3064874 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 10-15 * the whole document *; | [E]US2019078833 (GRAZIANO MARCO EMILIO [US]) [E] 13-15* the whole document * | International search | [A]KR20070032511 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.) [A] 1-15 * See claims 1, 5 and figure 3. *; | [A]KR100705767B (DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CORP [KR]) [A] 1-15* See claims 1-3 and figure 4. *; | [A]KR20120006287 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0045]-[0049], claims 1, 13 and figure 2. *; | [A]KR20150093357 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0048]-[0052], claims 1, 2, 4, 5, 12 and figures 2-5. *; | [A]KR20160148897 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0009]-[0015], claims 1-4 and figure 2. * |