EP3596683 - REPLACING TOKEN ON A MULTI-TOKEN USER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.12.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Visa International Service Association 900 Metro Center Boulevard Foster City, CA 94404 / US | [2020/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOPEZ, Eduardo 2191 Valparaiso Avenue Menlo Park California 94025 / US | 02 /
YOST, Robert 355 1st Street Unit Nr. S905 San Francisco, California 94105 / US | [2020/04] | Representative(s) | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/04] | EIP EIP Europe LLP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 18767466.8 | 16.03.2018 | [2020/04] | WO2018US22924 | Priority number, date | US201715462658 | 17.03.2017 Original published format: US201715462658 | [2020/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018170431 | Date: | 20.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3596683 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/20, G06Q20/22, G06Q20/34, G06Q20/38, G06Q20/02, G06Q20/40, G06Q30/00 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
G06Q20/401 (EP,US);
G06Q20/204 (EP,US);
G06Q20/227 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3552 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3572 (EP,US);
G06Q20/385 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/04] | G06Q20/38, G06Q20/02, G06Q20/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] | Title | German: | ERSATZ EINES TOKENS AUF EINER MEHRTOKEN-BENUTZERVORRICHTUNG | [2020/04] | English: | REPLACING TOKEN ON A MULTI-TOKEN USER DEVICE | [2020/04] | French: | REMPLACEMENT DE JETON SUR UN DISPOSITIF UTILISATEUR À JETONS MULTIPLES | [2020/04] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 03.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013086389 (SUWALD THOMAS [DE]); | [XI]US2015127547 (POWELL GLENN LEON [US], et al); | [I]US2016267466 (KUMNICK PHILLIP [US], et al); | [XI]WO2016183338 (DYNAMICS INC [US], et al) | International search | [A]KR20120059473 (BIZMODELINE CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2015066768 (WILLIAMSON GREGORY [US], et al); | [X]US2015199679 (PALANISAMY KARTHIKEYAN [US], et al); | [A]US2016110709 (LACOSS-ARNOLD JASON JAY [US]); | [A]US2016275512 (BONDESEN LAURA CORINNE [US], et al) |