EP3595719 - LINKER UNITS AND MOLECULAR CONSTRUCTS COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2023 [2023/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immunwork Inc. 18F., No.3, Park St. Nangang District Taipei City 115 / TW | [2020/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Tse-Wen 13F., No. 21, Aly. 21, Ln. 98, Sec. 2 Academia Road Nangang District Taipei 115 / TW | 02 /
CHU, Hsing-Mao 1F., No. 47., Sec. 2, Academia Road Nangang District Taipei 115 / TW | [2020/04] | Representative(s) | Lang, Christian LangPatent Anwaltskanzlei IP Law Firm Ingolstädter Straße 5 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/04] | Lang, Christian LangPatent Anwaltskanzlei Ingolstädter Straße 5 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18767591.3 | 16.03.2018 | [2020/04] | WO2018CN79301 | Priority number, date | US201762472011P | 16.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762472011 P | US201862613401P | 03.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862613401 P | [2020/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018166529 | Date: | 20.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3595719 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/65, A61K47/64, A61K47/68, A61P35/00 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
A61K47/6889 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K16/2809 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K47/60 (IL,RU,US);
A61K47/65 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K47/64 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K47/6817 (IL,US);
A61K47/6849 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K47/6859 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K47/6867 (EP,IL);
|
Former IPC [2020/04] | A61K39/395, C12P21/08, C07K16/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] | Title | German: | LINKEREINHEITEN UND MOLEKULARE KONSTRUKTIONEN DAMIT | [2020/04] | English: | LINKER UNITS AND MOLECULAR CONSTRUCTS COMPRISING SAME | [2020/04] | French: | UNITÉS DE LIAISON ET ASSEMBLAGES MOLÉCULAIRES LES COMPRENANT | [2020/04] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 13.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 28.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/39] | 24.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2015031268 (UNIV ARIZONA STATE [US], et al) [A] 1,2,5,7,8* figures 2A,5 *; | [XDI]WO2016112870 (CHANG TSE-WEN [CN], et al) [XD] 1-4,6-15 * scheme 4 on page 74 * * scheme on page 76 * * scheme 8 on page 96 * * scheme 9 on page 97 * * scheme on page 98 * * scheme on page 99 * * scheme 12 on page 100 * * paragraphs [0034] - [0038] - [0040] , [0041] , [0076] - [0081] - [0083] - [0085] - [0109] - [0115] - [0125] * * paragraphs [0439] - [0441] - [0443] , [0445] , [0446] , [0448] - [0450] * * examples 1-46 * * claim - * [I] 5; | [XI]WO2016184426 (CHANG TSE-WEN [CN], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,11-13 * scheme 4 on page 52 * * scheme on page 54 * * scheme 8 on page 74 * * schemes 9 and 10 on page 75 * * scheme 11 on page 76 * * scheme 12 on page 77; page 3, lines 24-25 * * paragraphs [0028] , [0029] , [0057] , [0058] , [0074] , [0075] , [0155] , [0195] - [0197] - [0230] - [0232] - [0236] , [0239] , [0240] * * paragraph [0259] * * example - * * claim - * [I] 5,9,10,14,15; | [XAI]WO2017036255 (CHANG TSE-WEN [CN], et al) [X] 1,2,6-8,12,13 * scheme 4 on page 44 * * scheme 5 on page 45 * * scheme 8 on page 63 * * schemes 9 and 10 on page 64 * * scheme 11 on page 65 * * paragraphs [0203] , [0207] , [0247] , [0248] , [0254] * * example - * * claim - * [A] 3,4,11 [I] 5,9,10,14,15; | [XAI]WO2017036407 (CHANG TSE-WEN [CN], et al) [X] 1,2,6-8,12,13 * scheme 4 on page 41 * * scheme 5 on page 42 * * paragraphs [0024] , [0025] , [0106] - [0110] - [0169] , [0170] * * example - * * claim - * [A] 3,4,11 [I] 5,9,10,14,15; | [E]WO2019057087 (CHANG TSE WEN [CN]) [E] 1-3,7,8,12,13 * page 23 * * paragraphs [0147] , [0152] - [0154] - [0200] - [0202] * * scheme 3 on page 25 * * claims 1,7-15 * | International search | [A]WO2014153002 (CALIFORNIA INST BIOMEDICAL RES [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * claims 35, 36, 43 *; | [A]WO2016112870 (CHANG TSE-WEN [CN], et al) [A] 1-23 * claims 1, 12, 13 *; | [A] - LI, W. L. et al., "New Advances in Bispecific Antibodies for Cancer Therapy", Chemistry of Life, (20101231), vol. 30, no. 6, pages 827 - 832, XP009504715 [A] 1-23 | [A] - CAO, G. et al., "Antibody-Drug Conjugates", Progress in Chemistry, (20140225), vol. 26, pages 467 - 477, XP055465696 [A] 1-23 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.7536/PC130650 | [A] - ZHU, G. D. et al., "Design of Next Generation Antibody Drug Conjugates", Acta Pharmaceutica Sinica, (20131231), vol. 48, no. 7, pages 1053 - 1070, XP009504713 [A] 1-23 |