EP3592939 - HELICAL COIL ANNULAR ACCESS PLUG AND ABANDONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ConocoPhillips Company 925 N. Eldridge Parkway Houston, Texas 77079 / US | [2020/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAFER, Randall, S. 600 N. Dairy Ashford MA 1135 Houston, TX 77079 / US | [2020/03] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2020/03] | Application number, filing date | 18768136.6 | 12.03.2018 | [2020/03] | WO2018US21965 | Priority number, date | US201762470234P | 11.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762470234 P | [2020/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018169847 | Date: | 20.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3592939 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3592939 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E21B29/00, E21B33/134 | [2020/49] | CPC: |
E21B33/134 (EP,US);
E21B29/002 (EP,US);
E21B29/02 (US);
E21B33/12 (US);
Y02P40/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/03] | E21B29/02, E21B33/13 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSCHLUSS UND RÜCKBAU MIT RINGFÖRMIGEN ZUGANGSSTOPFEN MIT SCHRAUBENFÖRMIGER SPULE | [2020/03] | English: | HELICAL COIL ANNULAR ACCESS PLUG AND ABANDONMENT | [2020/03] | French: | BOUCHON ET ABANDON D'ACCÈS ANNULAIRE À BOBINES HÉLICOÏDALES | [2020/03] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 25.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/03] | 12.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23189303.3 / EP4242418 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.08.2023 | CZ | 30.08.2023 | DK | 30.08.2023 | EE | 30.08.2023 | ES | 30.08.2023 | FI | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | IT | 30.08.2023 | LT | 30.08.2023 | LV | 30.08.2023 | NL | 30.08.2023 | PL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SE | 30.08.2023 | SI | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | PT | 02.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
IT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 30.08.2023 | |
GR | 01.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2014090846 (DEUTCH PAUL D [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-9,11-15 * paragraphs [0074] , [0082] , [0084] , [0088] , [0089] , [0093] , [0098] , [0214] , [0215] , [0233]; figure 25 * [I] 6; | [A]US2016046853 (CHATTERJI JITEN [US], et al) [A] 1-15* figure 6 *; | [X]WO2017030806 (SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 4, lines 27-32; figures 2, 5, 8, 9 * * page 5, lines 32-35 * * page 10, lines 19-22 * * page 11, lines 28-30 * | International search | [Y]US2004040710 (EDEN ROBERT DAVID [GB], et al) [Y] 5, 11 * Title, para[0001]-[0002], [0006]-[0007], [0023] *; | [A]WO2013085621 (EXXONMOBIL UPSTREAM RES CO [US], et al) [A] 1-20; | [A]US2013312963 (LARSEN ARNE GUNNAR [NO], et al) [A] 1-20* Entire document *; | [XY]US2014090846 (DEUTCH PAUL D [US], et al) [X] 1-4, 6-10, 12-20 * Abstract, para[0002], [0030]-[0032], [0074], [0076], [0084], [0088], [0104], [0215], [0222], [0233]; Figure 25 * [Y] 5, 11; | [A]US2016010423 (MYHRE MORTEN [NO], et al) [A] 1-20 * Entire document *; | [A]US2017016305 (PRIEUR JEAN-MARIE [GB], et al) [A] 1-20 * Entire document * |