EP3598303 - METHOD FOR MULTI-PATH COPYING AND PASTING, AND MOBILE TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vivo Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. 283 BBK Road Wusha Chang'An Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2020/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANG, Yi 283, BBK Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2020/11] |
Former [2020/04] | 01 /
TANG, Yi 283 BBK Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | Representative(s) | Conti, Marco Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | [2020/04] | Application number, filing date | 18768256.2 | 14.03.2018 | [2020/04] | WO2018CN78964 | Priority number, date | CN201710161462 | 17.03.2017 Original published format: CN201710161462 | [2020/04] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018166469 | Date: | 20.09.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3598303 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/54, G06F3/0486, G06F3/0484 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
G06F9/543 (EP,CN);
G06F40/166 (US);
G06F3/0482 (US);
G06F3/04842 (EP);
G06F3/04845 (US);
G06F3/0486 (EP);
G06F9/542 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM MEHRWEGEKOPIEREN UND -EINFÜGEN UND MOBILES ENDGERÄT | [2020/04] | English: | METHOD FOR MULTI-PATH COPYING AND PASTING, AND MOBILE TERMINAL | [2020/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR COPIER-COLLER MULTI-TRAJET, ET TERMINAL MOBILE | [2020/04] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2019 | Translation filed | 12.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 12.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 08.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP0785507 (CANON INFORMATION SYST INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * figures 3, 4a, 4b *; | [I]US2005172241 (DANIELS FONDA J [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0011] - [0012] * * paragraphs [0023] - [0037]; figures 2,3,4 *; | [A]US2007226713 (MCGOWAN PATRICK G [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] - [0003] * * paragraphs [0017] - [0018] *; | [A] - APPERLEY M ET AL, "Breaking the copy/paste cycle: the Stretchable Selection Tool", USER INTERFACE CONFERENCE, 2000. AUIC 2000. FIRST AUSTRALASIAN CANBERRA, ACT, AUSTRALIA 31 JAN.-3 FEB. 2000, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (20000131), ISBN 978-0-7695-0515-2, pages 3 - 10, XP010371179 [A] 1-15 * pages 6-7, paragraph 3.1 * | International search | [XY]CN102262565 [X] 1, 3-6, 8-12 [Y] 2, 7; | [Y]CN103064584 (DONGGUAN YULONG COMM TECH CO, et al) [Y] 2, 7; | [A]CN104679599 (BEIJING XIAOMI TECHNOLOGY CO) [A] 1-12; | [A]CN106168905 (BEIJING QIHOO TECH CO LTD)[A] 1-12; | [PX]CN106959901 (VIVO COMM TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [PX] 1-12 |