EP3597500 - DRIVING ASSISTANCE DEVICE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2025 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 12.03.2025 [2025/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Astemo, Ltd. 2520 Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | [2021/39] |
Former [2020/04] | For all designated states Hitachi Automotive Systems, Ltd. 2520 Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUDA, Satoshi c/o Hitachi Automotive Systems, Ltd. 2520, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIDA, Yoshiyuki c/o Hitachi Automotive Systems, Ltd. 2520, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | [2020/04] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2023/37] |
Former [2020/04] | Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 18768495.6 | 02.03.2018 | [2020/04] | WO2018JP07935 | Priority number, date | JP20170052688 | 17.03.2017 Original published format: JP 2017052688 | [2020/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018168512 | Date: | 20.09.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3597500 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3597500 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60W30/095, B60R21/00, G01C21/34, G08G1/16, B62D15/02, B60W30/14, B60W50/08, B60W50/10, B60W50/14, B60W60/00, G08G1/0962, G08G1/0967, G08G1/14 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
B60W50/14 (EP,US);
B60W30/0956 (US);
B60R21/00 (EP);
B60W30/09 (US);
B60W30/143 (EP);
B60W50/08 (EP);
B60W50/10 (EP);
B60W60/0011 (EP);
B62D15/0285 (EP);
G01C21/34 (EP);
G08G1/09626 (EP);
G08G1/096725 (EP);
G08G1/143 (EP);
G08G1/16 (US);
B60W2050/146 (EP,US);
B60W2420/403 (US);
B60W2420/54 (US);
B60W2520/28 (US);
G08G1/168 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/04] | B60W30/095, B60R21/00, G01C21/34, G08G1/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRHILFEVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN | [2020/04] | English: | DRIVING ASSISTANCE DEVICE AND METHOD | [2020/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ D'AIDE À LA CONDUITE | [2020/04] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2019 | Translation filed | 13.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 13.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 24.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.09.2023 | BG | 13.09.2023 | CZ | 13.09.2023 | DK | 13.09.2023 | EE | 13.09.2023 | ES | 13.09.2023 | FI | 13.09.2023 | HR | 13.09.2023 | IT | 13.09.2023 | LT | 13.09.2023 | LV | 13.09.2023 | MC | 13.09.2023 | NL | 13.09.2023 | PL | 13.09.2023 | RO | 13.09.2023 | RS | 13.09.2023 | SE | 13.09.2023 | SI | 13.09.2023 | SK | 13.09.2023 | SM | 13.09.2023 | NO | 13.12.2023 | GR | 14.12.2023 | IS | 13.01.2024 | PT | 15.01.2024 | GB | 02.03.2024 | IE | 02.03.2024 | LU | 02.03.2024 | BE | 31.03.2024 | CH | 31.03.2024 | FR | 31.03.2024 | [2025/11] |
Former [2025/10] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
BG | 13.09.2023 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
DK | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
IT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
MC | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SI | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
GB | 02.03.2024 | ||
IE | 02.03.2024 | ||
LU | 02.03.2024 | ||
BE | 31.03.2024 | ||
FR | 31.03.2024 | ||
Former [2025/09] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
BG | 13.09.2023 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
DK | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
IT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
MC | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SI | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
GB | 02.03.2024 | ||
LU | 02.03.2024 | ||
BE | 31.03.2024 | ||
FR | 31.03.2024 | ||
Former [2025/08] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
BG | 13.09.2023 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
DK | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
IT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
MC | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SI | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
LU | 02.03.2024 | ||
BE | 31.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/52] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
BG | 13.09.2023 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
DK | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
IT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
MC | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SI | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
LU | 02.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/51] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
BG | 13.09.2023 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
DK | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
IT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SI | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/49] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
DK | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
IT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SI | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
DK | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
IT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
IT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 13.09.2023 | |
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2016031660 (CLARION CO LTD) [X] 1-3,10 * paragraphs [0046] - [0049]; figure -; claim - *[Y] 4; | [XY]WO2016158236 (CLARION CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,5-10 * Machine Translated by EPO: see ESOP, passages mentioned under point 2.1;; figure - * [Y] 4 | International search | [Y]JP2001222800 (YAZAKI CORP) [Y] 1-10 * , paragraph [0002] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2005189936 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1-10 * , paragraphs [0002], [0021]-[0028], fig. 1-5 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2009271760 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 6 * , paragraphs [0056], [0057] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2012056428 (AISIN SEIKI) [Y] 1-10 * , paragraphs [0029]-[0049], fig. 1-11 (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2014203334 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * , paragraphs [0036]-[0066], fig. 1-8 (Family: none) *; | [PA]JP2017224075 (FUJITSU TEN LTD) [PA] 1-10* , claims (Family: none) * | Examination | JP2014108711 | by applicant | JP2016060336 |