EP3595497 - INFUSION ASSEMBLY AND CONTAINMENT VESSEL PROVIDED WITH SUCH AN INFUSION ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/04] | INFUSION ASSEMBLY, CONTAINMENT VESSEL PROVIDED WITH SUCH AN INFUSION ASSEMBLY, KIT FOR ASSEMBLING THE SAME, AND CORRESPONDING METHODS OF MANUFACTURING, OPERATING AND USE ASSOCIATED THERETO | ||
[2024/01] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Menna Corporation 3965 av. De Ramezay Montréal QC H3Y3K3 / CA | [2024/37] |
Former [2020/04] | For all designated states Menna Corporation 9460 Route Transcanadienne Saint-Laurent, Québec H4S 1R7 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALONI, Halysha Kaur 8-60 Carr St. Toronto Ontario M5T 1B7 / CA | 02 /
EISENBERG, Orit 3965 ave. de Ramezay Montréal Québec H3Y 3K3 / CA | [2020/04] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [2024/18] |
Former [2020/04] | Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 18768640.7 | 19.03.2018 | [2020/04] | WO2018CA50330 | Priority number, date | US201762472965P | 17.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762472965 P | [2020/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018165771 | Date: | 20.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3595497 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3595497 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 20.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/20, A45F3/16, A47G19/14, A47J31/06 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
A45F3/16 (EP);
A47J31/005 (EP,US);
A45F3/18 (EP,US);
A47J31/0626 (EP,US);
A47J31/0636 (EP);
A47J31/0652 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFUSIONSANORDNUNG UND MIT SOLCH EINER INFUSIONSANORDNUNG AUSGESTATTETER AUFNAHMEBEHÄLTER | [2024/01] | English: | INFUSION ASSEMBLY AND CONTAINMENT VESSEL PROVIDED WITH SUCH AN INFUSION ASSEMBLY | [2024/01] | French: | ENSEMBLE D'INFUSION ET RÉCEPTACLE POURVU D'UN TEL ENSEMBLE D'INFUSION | [2024/01] |
Former [2020/04] | INFUSIONSANORDNUNG, MIT SOLCH EINER INFUSIONSANORDNUNG AUSGESTATTETER AUFNAHMEBEHÄLTER, KIT ZUR MONTAGE DAVON UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG, BEDIENUNG UND VERWENDUNG IM ZUSAMMENHANG DAMIT | ||
Former [2020/04] | INFUSION ASSEMBLY, CONTAINMENT VESSEL PROVIDED WITH SUCH AN INFUSION ASSEMBLY, KIT FOR ASSEMBLING THE SAME, AND CORRESPONDING METHODS OF MANUFACTURING, OPERATING AND USE ASSOCIATED THERETO | ||
Former [2020/04] | ENSEMBLE D'INFUSION, RÉCEPTACLE POURVU D'UN TEL ENSEMBLE D'INFUSION, KIT D'ASSEMBLAGE DE CELUI-CI, ET PROCÉDÉS CORRESPONDANTS DE FABRICATION, DE COMMANDE ET D'UTILISATION ASSOCIÉS | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 17.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 24.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3657994 (POST NORMAN W) [X] 1,2,5 * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 61; figure - *; | [AD]US8985377 (LANE MARVIN [US]) [AD] 1-15* column 2, line 65 - column 8, line 12; figure - *; | [XI]WO2016205561 (TEANGO TECH INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5 * paragraphs [0053] - [0157]; figures 2A,2B, 3, 4, 5A, 5B * [I] 4 | International search | [Y]US9212067 (GELLIBOLIAN ROBERT [US], et al) [Y] 41-47*entire document*; | [Y]US2016296050 (LANE MARVIN [US]) [Y] 11, 20-26, 28 *entire document*; | [XY]US2016367072 (BOONE ALEXANDER [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 5, 27, 29, 30, 31, 33-37, 48-61, 64, 65, 67-70, 73-75, 78-80, 89, 94-98 *entire document* [Y] 4, 11, 20-26, 28, 38-47, 62, 63, 66, 71, 72, 76, 77, 81-88, 90-93 | by applicant | US4108053 | US4627334 | US5947004 | US5984141 | US6318244 | US7213507 | US2010224078 | US2010263549 | US7958816 | US8234971 | US2012225176 | US2013118358 | US2013239821 | CN203458139U | US8985377 | CN105231761 | CN105249667 | US9254950 | US9314126 | CN106175356 | WO2016205561 | WO2017041489 | US9713399 | US9743797 | US2017303725 |