EP3595691 - HERBAL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kerala Ayurveda Limited (India) Athani Post Aluva Ernakulam District Kerala 683585 / IN | For all designated states Katra Phytochem (India) Private Limited 1134 First Floor 100 Feet Road HAL 2nd Stage Indiranagar Bangalore 560008 / IN | [2020/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUBRAMONI, Patanjali 259 2nd Main 4th Cross Sai Enclave Kothnur Bangalore Karnataka 560076 / IN | 02 /
CHANDRASEKHARAN, Sundaram E 117 Habitat Splendour Gopalan Enterprises Next to CMR Institute Kundanahalli Bangalore Karnataka 560037 / IN | 03 /
MADHAVAN, Jayashree 1080-18/1 3rd B main Road E Block II Stage Rajajinagar Bangalore Karnataka 560010 / IN | 04 /
K, Anilkumar Sreerangam 8/502 Krishnaswamy Temple Road Aluva Kerala 683101 / IN | 05 /
SAMUEL, Sarala Kochakkan House Carmelgiri Semminary Road U. C. College P. O. Aluva 2, Ernakulam District Kerala 682102 / IN | 06 /
NAG, Bishwajit 4579 Martin Street Union City California 94587 / US | 07 /
VANGAL, Ramesh Blk 04-09 Nassim Jade No.3 Nassim Road Singapore 258371 / SG | 08 /
NAG, Nitish 4579 Martin Street Union City, California 94587 / US | 09 /
KODIKANNATH, Jayarajan 34471 Helston Place Fremont, California 94555 / US | [2020/04] | Representative(s) | ARC-IP ARC-IP sprl Rue Emile Francqui 4 1435 Mont-Saint-Guibert / BE | [2020/04] | Application number, filing date | 18768664.7 | 18.03.2018 | [2020/04] | WO2018IB51790 | Priority number, date | US201762473126P | 17.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762473126 P | [2020/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018167735 | Date: | 20.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3595691 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K36/00, A61K36/59, A61K36/9066, A61P3/10, A61K36/28, A61K36/47, A61K36/48 | [2020/48] | CPC: |
A61P3/10 (EP,KR);
A61K36/9066 (EP,KR,US);
A61K36/185 (US);
A61K36/28 (EP,KR,US);
A61K36/47 (EP,KR);
A61K36/48 (EP,KR,US);
A61K36/59 (EP,KR,US);
A61K36/61 (US);
A61K36/74 (US);
A61K9/0095 (US);
A61P3/04 (KR);
A61P3/06 (KR);
| C-Set: |
A61K36/28, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/47, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/48, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/59, A61K2300/00 (EP); |
Former IPC [2020/04] | A61K36/00, A61K36/59, A61K36/9066, A61P3/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] | Title | German: | KRÄUTERZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2020/04] | English: | HERBAL COMPOSITION | [2020/04] | French: | COMPOSITION À BASE DE PLANTES | [2020/04] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 08.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 14.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2021 | Observations by third parties | 16.08.2021 | Observations by third parties | 04.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 20.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]IN3088DEL2011 ; | [XY]US2010173022 (RAMAUTARSING DEVINDRA [NL]); | International search | [Y]US2003086987 (SHIAO MING-SHI [TW], et al) [Y] 1, 3-9 * entire document *; | [XY]US2010173022 (RAMAUTARSING DEVINDRA [NL]) [X] 10, 40, 42 * entire document * [Y] 1, 3-9, 41; | [Y]US2012035130 (PETER DAVID WAYNE [US], et al) [Y] 41* entire document *; | [Y]US2014147394 (CHAUDHARY MANU [IN]) [Y] 41 * entire document *; | [Y] - SELVARAJ et al., "Evaluation of wound healing and antimicrobial potentials of Ixora coccinea root extract", Asian Pacific Journal of Tropical Medicine, vol. 4, no. 12, (20111220), pages 959 - 963, URL: https://doi.org/10.1016/S1995-7645(11)60226-5, XP055551290 [Y] 41 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1995-7645(11)60226-5 | by applicant | US2010173022 | - "Antidiabetic effect of diasulin, a herbal drug, on blood glucose plasma insulin and hepatic enzymes of glucose metabolism hyperglycaemic rats", PARI, DIABETES, OBESTY AND METABOLISM, BLACKWELL SCIENCE, vol. 6, pages 286 - 292 |