EP3694755 - ELECTROPNEUMATIC PARKING BRAKE MODULE FOR LOAD VEHICLES WITH SPRING BRAKES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/34] | ELECTROPNEUMATIC PARKING BRAKE MODULE FOR UTILITY VEHICLES WITH SPRING-TYPE PARKING BRAKES | ||
[2021/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF CV Systems Hannover GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 30453 Hannover / DE | [2021/21] |
Former [2020/34] | For all designated states WABCO GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 30453 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN THIEL, Julian Nelkenweg 7 30938 Grossburgwedel / DE | [2020/34] | Representative(s) | Rabe, Dirk-Heinrich, et al ZF CV Systems Hannover GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 30453 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/30] | Schiller, Harald ZF CV Systems Hannover GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 30453 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2020/34] | Schiller, Harald Wabco GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 30453 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 18768794.2 | 30.08.2018 | [2020/34] | WO2018EP73379 | Priority number, date | DE20171009578 | 14.10.2017 Original published format: DE102017009578 | [2020/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019072452 | Date: | 18.04.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3694755 | Date: | 19.08.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3694755 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60T13/26, B60T13/38, B60T13/68, B60T17/22 | [2020/34] | CPC: |
B60T13/263 (EP,US);
B60T13/385 (EP,US);
B60T13/662 (EP);
B60T13/683 (EP,US);
B60T17/221 (EP,US);
B60T7/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROPNEUMATISCHES FESTSTELLBREMSMODUL FÜR NUTZFAHRZEUGE MIT FEDERSPEICHER-FESTSTELLBREMSEN | [2020/34] | English: | ELECTROPNEUMATIC PARKING BRAKE MODULE FOR LOAD VEHICLES WITH SPRING BRAKES | [2021/23] | French: | MODULE ELECTROMAGNETIQUE DE FREIN DE STATIONNEMENT POUR CAMION AVEC FREINS A RESSORT | [2021/23] |
Former [2020/34] | ELECTROPNEUMATIC PARKING BRAKE MODULE FOR UTILITY VEHICLES WITH SPRING-TYPE PARKING BRAKES | ||
Former [2020/34] | MODULE DE FREINAGE DE STATIONNEMENT ÉLECTROPNEUMATIQUE POUR VÉHICULES UTILITAIRES COMPRENANT DES FREINS DE STATIONNEMENT À RESSORT ACCUMULATEUR | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/34] | 14.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.08.2018 | AL | 28.07.2021 | CY | 28.07.2021 | CZ | 28.07.2021 | DK | 28.07.2021 | EE | 28.07.2021 | ES | 28.07.2021 | FI | 28.07.2021 | HR | 28.07.2021 | IT | 28.07.2021 | LT | 28.07.2021 | LV | 28.07.2021 | MC | 28.07.2021 | MK | 28.07.2021 | NL | 28.07.2021 | PL | 28.07.2021 | RO | 28.07.2021 | RS | 28.07.2021 | SE | 28.07.2021 | SI | 28.07.2021 | SK | 28.07.2021 | SM | 28.07.2021 | IE | 30.08.2021 | LU | 30.08.2021 | BE | 31.08.2021 | CH | 31.08.2021 | LI | 31.08.2021 | BG | 28.10.2021 | NO | 28.10.2021 | GR | 29.10.2021 | IS | 28.11.2021 | PT | 29.11.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 30.08.2018 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
IE | 30.08.2021 | ||
LU | 30.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
IE | 30.08.2021 | ||
LU | 30.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
IE | 30.08.2021 | ||
LU | 30.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
IE | 30.08.2021 | ||
LU | 30.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
LU | 30.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
LU | 30.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | CZ | 28.07.2021 | |
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
LU | 30.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | CZ | 28.07.2021 | |
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
LU | 30.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | DK | 28.07.2021 | |
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | ES | 28.07.2021 | |
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | ES | 28.07.2021 | |
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | ES | 28.07.2021 | |
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 28.07.2021 | |
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE10336611 (WABCO GMBH & CO OHG [DE]) [AD] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 2 ** paragraphs [0051] - [0053] *; | [A]DE102006041011 (WABCO GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0074] , [0075] * * figure 7 *; | [AD]EP2121397 (WABCO GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0063] - [0072] * * figures 5-8 *; | [AD]EP2615003 (WABCO GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 3 * | by applicant | DE10336611 | EP2121397 | EP2615003 |