EP3684447 - ACCESSORY DEVICE FOR DRUG DELIVERY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [2020/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEDERSEN, Bennie Peder Smiszek Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | 02 /
MOURIDSEN, Brian Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | 03 /
HØHOLT, Jesper Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | 04 /
LINNEBJERG, Steven Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | 05 /
BOM, Lars Morten Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [2020/31] | Application number, filing date | 18769225.6 | 21.09.2018 | [2020/31] | WO2018EP75639 | Priority number, date | EP20170192643 | 22.09.2017 Original published format: EP 17192643 | EP20180191890 | 31.08.2018 Original published format: EP 18191890 | [2020/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019057911 | Date: | 28.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3684447 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3684447 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/24 | [2020/31] | CPC: |
A61M5/24 (EP);
A61M5/31551 (EP,US);
A61M5/2033 (US);
A61M5/2466 (US);
A61M5/31553 (EP,US);
A61M5/31568 (US);
A61M5/3158 (US);
A61M2005/2407 (EP);
A61M2005/2411 (EP);
A61M2005/3126 (US);
A61M2205/3306 (EP);
A61M2205/3317 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3327 (EP);
A61M2205/3561 (EP);
A61M2205/50 (EP);
A61M2205/52 (EP);
A61M2205/6063 (EP);
A61M2205/6081 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSATZVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE ARZNEIMITTELAUSGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2021/52] | English: | ACCESSORY DEVICE FOR DRUG DELIVERY DEVICE | [2020/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF ACCESSOIRE POUR DISPOSITIF D'ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENTS | [2021/52] |
Former [2020/31] | ZUBEHÖRVORRICHTUNG FÜR ARZNEIMITTELAUSGABEVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2020/31] | DISPOSITIF ACCESSOIRE POUR DISPOSITIF D'ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENT | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/31] | 22.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.09.2018 | AL | 13.07.2022 | AT | 13.07.2022 | BG | 13.07.2022 | CY | 13.07.2022 | CZ | 13.07.2022 | EE | 13.07.2022 | FI | 13.07.2022 | HR | 13.07.2022 | LT | 13.07.2022 | LV | 13.07.2022 | MC | 13.07.2022 | MK | 13.07.2022 | RO | 13.07.2022 | RS | 13.07.2022 | SI | 13.07.2022 | SK | 13.07.2022 | SM | 13.07.2022 | IE | 21.09.2022 | LU | 21.09.2022 | BE | 30.09.2022 | NO | 13.10.2022 | GR | 14.10.2022 | IS | 13.11.2022 | PT | 14.11.2022 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 21.09.2018 | |
AL | 13.07.2022 | ||
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CY | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
MK | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
IE | 21.09.2022 | ||
LU | 21.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HU | 21.09.2018 | |
AL | 13.07.2022 | ||
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CY | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
IE | 21.09.2022 | ||
LU | 21.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CY | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
IE | 21.09.2022 | ||
LU | 21.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
IE | 21.09.2022 | ||
LU | 21.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
IE | 21.09.2022 | ||
LU | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
IE | 21.09.2022 | ||
LU | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
LU | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 13.07.2022 | |
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 13.07.2022 | |
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 13.07.2022 | |
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 13.07.2022 | |
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 13.07.2022 | |
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2010056367 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US], et al) [X] 10-12 * figures 1, 3, 17, 20, 24 * * paragraphs [0007] , [0 48] , [0 49] , [0 54] * [I] 13-15; | [A]WO2012046199 (MEIRING HENDRIK [ZA]) [A] 1-15* figures 6-8 *; | [A]WO2016193229 (INSULCLOUD S L [ES]) [A] 1-15 * figures 2a-c, 5b * * page 15, line 29 - page 16, line 1 * * page 17, line 28 - page 18, line 2 *; | [XI]EP3103492 (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [X] 1,2,6,9 * figures 1, 3, 8 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0 33] , [0 35] - [0038] - [0 40] , [0 43] * [I] 3-5,7,8 | by applicant | US2009318865 | WO2010052275 | WO2010056367 | WO2014020008 | WO2014037331 | WO2014161952 | EP3103492 | EP20170178059 |