10.09.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.08.2024 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
08.08.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.09.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.08.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.07.2022 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.03.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.03.2022 |
First examination report |
|
18.03.2022 |
Change - applicant |
published on 20.04.2022 [2022/16] |
20.08.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.11.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 30.12.2020 [2020/53] |
27.11.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 30.12.2020 [2020/53] |
17.11.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.06.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
26.06.2020 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
26.06.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
13.05.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.04.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.04.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
22.04.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.04.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.04.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.03.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.12.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.09.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|