EP3676699 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CONFIGURING AND MONITORING VIRTUAL APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (PUBL) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2020/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DO, Hoang 1829 Bachman Court 75075 Plano / US | 02 /
ODOBETSKIY, Sergey 3192 Trailside Drive Oakville, Ontario L6M 0N9 / CA | [2020/28] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/28] | Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18769790.9 | 14.08.2018 | [2020/28] | WO2018IB56113 | Priority number, date | US201762552301P | 30.08.2017 Original published format: US 201762552301 P | US201815893406 | 09.02.2018 Original published format: US201815893406 | [2020/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019043492 | Date: | 07.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3676699 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3676699 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F8/61, H04L43/0817, G06F9/445, G06F8/60, H04L41/0806, G06F9/455, H04L41/5041, H04L41/40, H04L41/0895, H04L43/20, H04L41/50 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
G06F9/45558 (EP,US);
G06F8/60 (EP,US);
G06F8/61 (EP,US);
G06F9/44505 (EP,US);
G06F9/45529 (US);
H04L41/0806 (EP,US);
H04L41/0895 (EP);
H04L41/40 (EP);
H04L41/5048 (EP,US);
H04L43/0817 (EP,US);
H04L43/20 (EP);
G06F2009/45591 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/28] | G06F8/61, H04L12/24, H04L12/26, G06F9/445 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR KONFIGURATION UND ÜBERWACHUNG VIRTUELLER ANWENDUNGEN | [2023/14] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CONFIGURING AND MONITORING VIRTUAL APPLICATIONS | [2020/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR CONFIGURER ET SURVEILLER DES APPLICATIONS VIRTUELLES | [2023/14] |
Former [2020/28] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR KONFIGURATION UND ÜBERWACHUNG VON VIRTUELLEN ANWENDUNGEN | ||
Former [2020/28] | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONFIGURATION ET DE SURVEILLANCE D'APPLICATIONS VIRTUELLES | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/28] | 06.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 14.06.2023 | HR | 14.06.2023 | MC | 14.06.2023 | RO | 14.06.2023 | RS | 14.06.2023 | SK | 14.06.2023 | SM | 14.06.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | NO | 14.09.2023 | GR | 15.09.2023 | IS | 14.10.2023 | [2024/24] |
Former [2024/16] | CZ | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
MC | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | HR | 14.06.2023 | |
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 14.06.2023 | |
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | NO | 14.09.2023 | |
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | NO | 14.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2017006083 (MCDONNELL KEVIN JAMES [IE]) [A] 1-22* abstract *; | [I] - JOHN WOLFGANG ET AL, "Meeting the observability challenges for VNFs in 5G systems", 2017 IFIP/IEEE SYMPOSIUM ON INTEGRATED NETWORK AND SERVICE MANAGEMENT (IM), IFIP, (20170508), doi:10.23919/INM.2017.7987445, pages 1127 - 1130, XP033127728 [I] 1-22 * page 1, column right, paragraph penultimate * * section A; page 3 * * page 3, column right, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * * page 2, column right, paragraph penultimate * * page 3, column left, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.23919/INM.2017.7987445 | [A] - Mehta Vadan, "NFV SDN for Telco Cloud: What is VNF Silo ???", (20151107), pages 1 - 3, URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20170113000649/http://nfvsdnplunge.blogspot.com/2015/11/what-is-vnf-silo.html, (20181129), XP055528672 [A] 1-22 * figure 2; claims 1,6 * | [A] - Mehmet Ersue, "ETSI NFV Management and Orchestration - An Overview", https://www.ietf.org/meeting/88/, (20131108), URL: https://www.ietf.org/proceedings/88/slides/slides-88-opsawg-6.pdf, (20171114), XP055424969 [A] 1-22 * page 9 * |