EP3635508 - HINGED DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2021/45] |
Former [2020/16] | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIDDIQUI, Kabir Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
TAZBAZ, Errol Mark Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
AAGAARD, Karsten Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2020/16] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [2020/16] | Application number, filing date | 18770125.5 | 23.05.2018 | [2020/16] | WO2018US34011 | Priority number, date | US201715618067 | 08.06.2017 Original published format: US201715618067 | [2020/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018226399 | Date: | 13.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3635508 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3635508 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/16, H04M1/02 | [2020/16] | CPC: |
G06F1/1681 (EP,US);
G06F1/1616 (US);
E05D11/08 (US);
E05D3/122 (US);
F16C11/04 (US);
G06F1/1637 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GELENKIGER APPARAT | [2023/44] | English: | HINGED DEVICE | [2020/16] | French: | APPAREIL ARTICULÉ | [2023/44] |
Former [2020/16] | SCHARNIERVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2020/16] | DISPOSITIF ARTICULÉ | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/16] | 13.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.12.2023 | CZ | 27.12.2023 | EE | 27.12.2023 | ES | 27.12.2023 | FI | 27.12.2023 | HR | 27.12.2023 | IT | 27.12.2023 | LT | 27.12.2023 | LV | 27.12.2023 | NL | 27.12.2023 | PL | 27.12.2023 | RO | 27.12.2023 | RS | 27.12.2023 | SE | 27.12.2023 | SK | 27.12.2023 | SM | 27.12.2023 | BG | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.03.2024 | GR | 28.03.2024 | IS | 27.04.2024 | PT | 29.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 27.12.2023 | |
CZ | 27.12.2023 | ||
EE | 27.12.2023 | ||
ES | 27.12.2023 | ||
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RO | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 27.12.2023 | |
ES | 27.12.2023 | ||
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 27.12.2023 | |
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 28.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US2005239520 (STEFANSEN MADS S [DK]) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * figures 1-3, 5, 9-10 * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0068] * [A] 8-12,14,15 [I] 13; | [A]WO2017087343 (MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0040]; figures 1-14, 18 ,21 * |