EP3603058 - DEPTH BASED FOVEATED RENDERING FOR DISPLAY SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magic Leap, Inc. 7500 W. Sunrise Boulevard Plantation, FL 33322 / US | [2024/27] |
Former [2020/06] | For all designated states Magic Leap, Inc. 7500 W. Sunrise Boulevard Plantation, FL 33322 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YEOH, Ivan Li Chuen 7500 W. Sunrise Blvd. Plantation, Florida 33322 / US | 02 /
EDWIN, Lionel Ernest 7500 W. Sunrise Blvd. Plantation, Florida 33322 / US | 03 /
MATHUR, Vaibhav 7500 W. Sunrise Blvd. Plantation, Florida 33322 / US | 04 /
DALRYMPLE, Timothy, Mark 7500 W. Sunrise Blvd. Plantation, Florida 33322 / US | 05 /
SCHAEFER, Jason 7500 W. Sunrise Blvd. Plantation, Florida 33322 / US | 06 /
CARLISLE, Clinton 7500 W. Sunrise Blvd. Plantation, Florida 33322 / US | 07 /
CHENG, Hui-Chuan 7500 W. Sunrise Blvd. Plantation, Florida 33322 / US | 08 /
OH, Chulwoo 7500 W. Sunrise Blvd. Plantation, Florida 33322 / US | 09 /
PREMYSLER, Philip 7500 W. Sunrise Blvd. Plantation, Florida 33322 / US | 10 /
ZHANG, Xiaoyang 7500 W. Sunrise Blvd. Plantation, Florida 33322 / US | 11 /
CARLSON, Adam, C. 7500 W. Sunrise Blvd. Plantation, Florida 33322 / US | 12 /
SAMEC, Nicole Elizabeth 7500 W. Sunrise Blvd. Plantation, Florida 33322 / US | 13 /
ROBAINA, Nastasja U. 7500 W. Sunrise Blvd. Plantation, Florida 33322 / US | [2024/08] |
Former [2020/06] | 01 /
YEOH, Ivan Li Chuen 7500 W. Sunrise Blvd. Plantation Florida 33322 / US | ||
02 /
EDWIN, Lionel Ernest 7500 W. Sunrise Blvd. Plantation Florida 33322 / US | |||
03 /
MATHUR, Vaibhav 7500 W. Sunrise Blvd. Plantation Florida 33322 / US | |||
04 /
DALRYMPLE, Tim, Mark 7500 W. Sunrise Blvd. Plantation Florida 33322 / US | |||
05 /
SCHAEFER, Jason 7500 W. Sunrise Blvd. Plantation Florida 33322 / US | |||
06 /
CARLISLE, Clinton 7500 W. Sunrise Blvd. Plantation Florida 33322 / US | |||
07 /
CHENG, Hui-Chuan 7500 W. Sunrise Blvd. Plantation Florida 33322 / US | |||
08 /
OH, Chulwoo 7500 W. Sunrise Blvd. Plantation Florida 33322 / US | |||
09 /
PREMYSLER, Philip 7500 W. Sunrise Blvd. Plantation Florida 33322 / US | |||
10 /
ZHANG, Xiaoyang 7500 W. Sunrise Blvd. Plantation Florida 33322 / US | |||
11 /
CARLSON, Adam, C. 7500 W. Sunrise Blvd. Plantation Florida 33322 / US | |||
12 /
SAMEC, Nicole Elizabeth 7500 W. Sunrise Blvd. Plantation Florida 33322 / US | |||
13 /
ROBAINA, Nastasja U. 7500 W. Sunrise Blvd. Plantation Florida 33322 / US | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [2024/27] |
Former [2020/06] | Lecomte & Partners 76-78, rue de Merl 2146 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 18770261.8 | 21.03.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018US23619 | Priority number, date | US201762475012P | 22.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762475012 P | US201762486407P | 17.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762486407 P | US201762539934P | 01.08.2017 Original published format: US 201762539934 P | US201862644365P | 16.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862644365 P | [2020/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018175625 | Date: | 27.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3603058 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3603058 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/383, H04N13/344, G06F3/01, G02B27/01, G02B27/00, G06T15/00, H04N13/279, H04N13/395, H04N13/398, G06F3/0346 | [2024/07] | CPC: |
G02B27/0172 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
H04N13/383 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
G02B27/0093 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
G06F3/011 (EP,IL);
G06F3/012 (EP,IL);
G06F3/013 (EP,CN,IL);
G06F3/0346 (EP,IL);
G06T15/00 (EP,IL,US);
G06T19/006 (IL,US);
G06T7/246 (CN);
H04N13/139 (KR);
H04N13/279 (EP,IL,US);
H04N13/324 (KR);
H04N13/341 (IL,US);
H04N13/344 (EP,IL,KR,US);
H04N13/395 (EP,IL,US);
H04N13/398 (EP,CN,IL,US);
G02B2027/0134 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
G02B2027/0147 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
G02B2027/0178 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
G02B2027/0185 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/01] | H04N13/383, H04N13/344, G06F3/01, G02B27/01 | ||
Former IPC [2020/06] | H04N13/383, H04N13/344, G02B27/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TIEFENBASIERTE FOVEA-DARSTELLUNG FÜR ANZEIGESYSTEME | [2020/06] | English: | DEPTH BASED FOVEATED RENDERING FOR DISPLAY SYSTEMS | [2020/06] | French: | RESTITUTION FOVÉALE BASÉE SUR LA PROFONDEUR POUR SYSTÈMES D'AFFICHAGE | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 28.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.02.2024 | 26.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24184497.6 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2016026253 (BRADSKI GARY R [US], et al); | [Y]US2016070344 (GOHL MARK [GB]); | [Y]US2016328884 (SCHOWENGERDT BRIAN T [US], et al); | [XY]US2016379606 (KOLLIN JOEL S [US], et al); | [XYI]WO2017025487 (SENSOMOTORIC INSTR GES FÜR INNOVATIVE SENSORIK MBH [DE]); | [E]US2018227630 (SCHMIDT EBERHARD [DE], et al) | International search | [Y]WO0062543 (UNIV NEW YORK [US], et al); | [A]US2004227699 (MITCHELL BRIAN T [US]); | [A]US2013300635 (WHITE SEAN [US], et al); | [XYA]US2016026253 (BRADSKI GARY R [US], et al); | [Y]US2016364881 (MALLINSON DOMINIC SAUL [US], et al) | Examination | WO2017031246 |